Cox Cox Filo Camel & Wilson L L C v. Sasol North America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Cox Cox Filo Camel & Wilson L L C
Defendant: Timothy Ward, Jay Arthur Bly, Peter Markey, Mary Ann Fisher, Mary Lou Sapone, Wendell Richard Dick Rogers and Sasol North America Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv00856
Filed: June 8, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 84 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Wendell Richard Dick Rogers, Mary Lou Sapone, Timothy Ward, Jay Arthur Bly,and GRANTING 79 MOTION to Remand filed by Cox Cox Filo Camel & Wilson L L C, and 83 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Peter Markey, Sasol North America Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 8/21/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 16, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING stating reasons for GRANTING 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wendell Richard Dick Rogers, Mary Lou Sapone, Timothy Ward, Jay Arthur Bly and GRANTING 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Peter Markey, Sasol North America Inc. 72 Judgment dismissed claims for reasons stated herein. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 10/3/12. (crt,FinnSld, P)
June 14, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 61 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge affirming the 60 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Remand filed by Cox Cox Filo Camel & Wilson L L C. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 6/14/12. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 30, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 14 Motion to Remand and 43 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/30/12. (crt,Finn, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox Cox Filo Camel & Wilson L L C v. Sasol North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Ward
Represented By: Douglas Allen Littlejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Arthur Bly
Represented By: Douglas Allen Littlejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Markey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lou Sapone
Represented By: Douglas Allen Littlejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell Richard Dick Rogers
Represented By: Douglas Allen Littlejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasol North America Inc
Represented By: Richard C Smith
Represented By: Matthew H Kirtland
Represented By: Erich P Rapp
Represented By: Tracy Steward DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Cox Filo Camel & Wilson L L C
Represented By: Thomas E Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?