Nelson v. Lake Charles Stevedores L L C et al

Plaintiff: Chaquitha Roshawn Nelson
Defendant: Local 2047 International Longshoremens Association, Marvin Cole, Sr, International Longshoremens Association Inc and Lake Charles Stevedores L L C
Case Number: 2:2011cv01377
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lake Charles Stevedores L L C; GRANTING 93 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Marvin Cole, Sr; DENYING AS MOOT 84 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT filed by Local 2047 International Longshoremens Association; and GRANTING 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Local 2047 International Longshoremens Association. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/31/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 17, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part the 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lake Charles Stevedores L L C. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/15/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 17, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by International Longshoremens Association Inc. Sanctions will be denied. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 10/16/12. (crt,Finn, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Lake Charles Stevedores L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaquitha Roshawn Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 2047 International Longshoremens Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Cole, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoremens Association Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Charles Stevedores L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?