Broussard et al v. T M R Co et al

Plaintiff: Leonard Broussard and Bertha Thibodeaux
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc, Four Star Oil & Gas Co, T M R Co, Dow Chemical Co and Universal Minerals Corp
Case Number: 2:2011cv01446
Filed: August 9, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Cameron
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Claims filed by Chevron U S A Inc, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/4/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 1, 2013 180 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Certain Affirmative Defenses Pled by Chevron Defendants filed by Leonard Broussard, Bertha Thibodeaux is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 9/17/2013. (crt,Finn, P)
June 14, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: re 69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Restoration Obligation filed by Four Star Oil & Gas Co, Chevron U S A Inc, Chevron U S A Holdings Inc. IT IS ORDERED that the parties supplement their briefs within s even (7) days of the date of this order to discuss the ruling that the contract claims uner the 1962 lease have prescribed may or may not affect the arguments presented in the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Restoration Obligations under the same lease. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 06/14/2013. (crt,BenoitSld, J)
December 3, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dow Chemical Co, and GRANTING 47 MOTION to Seal Document 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibit 4 and Exhibit 11 filed by Dow Chemical Co. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/2/12. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard et al v. T M R Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Broussard
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Jonathan Fontenot
Represented By: Kenneth T Fibich
Represented By: Kurt B Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Thibodeaux
Represented By: Jonathan Fontenot
Represented By: Kenneth T Fibich
Represented By: Kurt B Arnold
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Holdings Inc
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Star Oil & Gas Co
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T M R Co
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Co
Represented By: David M Bienvenu, Jr
Represented By: John Michael Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Minerals Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?