Johnson v. Railroad Controls L P et al
Plaintiff: |
Chad Johnson and Betty Johnson |
Defendant: |
Railroad Controls L P, Burlington Northern & Santa Fe Railway Co and T N T Equipment Sales & Rentals Inc |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv01722 |
Filed: |
September 26, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Lake Charles Office |
County: |
Allen |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen Kay |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia Minaldi |
Nature of Suit: |
Federal Employers Liability |
Cause of Action: |
45 U.S.C. § 51 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 10, 2015 |
Filing
233
MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by B N S F Railway Co. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 02/10/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
|
January 22, 2015 |
Filing
228
MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Railroad Controls L P. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/20/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
|
December 17, 2014 |
Filing
210
MEMORANDUM RULING granting 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Navistar Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/17/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing
118
MEMORANDUM RULING that the 69 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Navistar Inc is DENIED as to the plaintiffs' claim for a construction or composition defect under the LPLA and is GRANTED as to the plaintiffs' cla ims under the LPLA for a design defect; 69 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim 94 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over subject matter filed by Railroad Controls L P, B N S F Railway Co, 78 MOTION to S tay is DENIED, AS MOOT; 85 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Diversified Metal Fabricators Inc, IS denied as to the plaintiffs' claim for a construction or composition defect under the LPLA and is GRANTED as to the plaintiffs' claim under the LPLA for a design defect; 91 MOTION to Stay is DENIED, AS MOOT; 94 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over subject matter, is GRANTED and the claims under the FELA Act 45 USC 51-60, i ncluding Mrs. Johnson's claims for loss of consortium under FELA are DISMISSED. The dismissal of the plaintiffs' FELA claims shall have no effect on the plaintiffs' state law claims; 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment with opposition filed by Chad Johnson is DENIED; 107 Motion is DENIED, AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 7/1/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
|
January 22, 2014 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Railroad Controls L P, B N S F Railway Co; and DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by T N T Equipment Sales & Rentals Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/15/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?