Malbrough et al v. Kanawha Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Carmen Malbrough and Lionel Simon
Defendant: Gilchrist Construction Co L L C and Kanawha Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2011cv01842
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Jefferson Davis
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 85 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Willis of Louisiana Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 11/11/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
April 29, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kanawha Insurance Co, 26 MOTION for Telephone Status Conference filed by Lionel Simon, Carmen Malbrough, 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respon se/Reply as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lionel Simon, Carmen Malbrough; The parties are to contact Magistrate Judge Kay's chambers within 10 days of the issuance of this ruling in order to set a discovery schedule and other deadlines. Additionally, because the undersigned disagrees with Kanawha that the additional evidence the plaintiff seek would not affect the viability of their claims, the court dismisses the pending Motion for Summary Judgment as premature. The defendants may file a renewed Motion for Summary Judgment after the parties have been given a chance to conduct discovery. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 4/29/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 11, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Gilchrist Construction Co L L C. Plaintiffs are given 30 days to amend their complaint. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 10/11/2012. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malbrough et al v. Kanawha Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilchrist Construction Co L L C
Represented By: L Lane Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanawha Insurance Co
Represented By: Errol J King, Jr
Represented By: Layna S Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Malbrough
Represented By: Aaron James Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Simon
Represented By: Aaron James Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?