Ruffin v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Verna Ruffin
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc, Takeda Global Research & Development Center Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals L L C, Takeda San Diego Inc, Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc and Eli Lilly & Co
Case Number: 2:2011cv02007
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2014 212 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RULING. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/30/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Brown, A)
January 27, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RULING. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/27/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Brown, A)
November 5, 2013 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting (3440) Report and Recommendations on Distribution of Funds in case 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, et al.Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/5/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Brown, A)
September 3, 2013 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in its entirety (3214) Report and Recommendations of Special Master Discovery Concerning Sales Personnel in case 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/3/2013. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffin v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Ruffin
Represented By: Jessica W Hayes
Represented By: Arthur Mahony Murray
Represented By: Stephen B Murray
Represented By: Robin Marie Myers
Represented By: Tina L Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Global Research & Development Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda San Diego Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?