Daley v. Micieli et al

Plaintiff: Dameon Daley
Defendant: J Micieli, G Kizziah, J P Young and Inouye
Case Number: 2:2011cv02010
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 18 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Daley's remaining claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in accordance with the provisions of FED.R.CIV.P.41(b). Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on May 23, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
November 17, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the 14 Report and Recommendations is AMENDED, IN PART, and as amended, AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of the Daley's claims, except the claim for violation of his Eighth Amendment rights arising of failure to adequately clothe him, be and hereby are DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, as frivolous and for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 11/11/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 2, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 9 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Dameon Daley. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 10/2/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 4, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 5 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the 1 Complaint filed by Dameon Daley be DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as all of his complaints are barred by the statute of limitations and, thus, are frivolous in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC 1915(A). Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 10/3/12. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daley v. Micieli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameon Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Micieli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inouye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?