Gatte et al v. Ready For A Change L L C et al

Plaintiff: Tammy Gatte and Colby Gatte
Defendant: Judy Dohm, Ready 4 A Change L L C, Rafael Velasco Marin, Ezequiel Gamez Hinojosa, Hector Joaquin Perez Corzo, Guillermina Gamez and Clinica Victoria Hospital
Case Number: 2:2011cv02083
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 65 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 65 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 7/30/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 16, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 45 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Colby Gatte, Tammy Gatte is DENIED; The court herein adopts in full the reasoning set forth in its prioer re 43 Memorandum Ruling. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 9/16/2013. (crt,Finn, P)
January 9, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, Insufficient Service of Process and Failure to State a Claim filed by Judy Dohm, Ready 4 A Change L L C, will be granted; and that the 29 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Briefing Deadline on Defendants Motion to Dismiss to Allow Discovery with opposition filed by Colby Gatte, Tammy Gatte and the 36 MOTION for Discovery will be DENIED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/7/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatte et al v. Ready For A Change L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Gatte
Represented By: Claude Pierson Devall
Represented By: John Lee Hoffoss, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth H Hooks, III
Represented By: Donald W McKnight
Represented By: Henry Price Mounger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Gatte
Represented By: Claude Pierson Devall
Represented By: John Lee Hoffoss, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth H Hooks, III
Represented By: Donald W McKnight
Represented By: Henry Price Mounger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Dohm
Represented By: Kendrick James Guidry
Represented By: Joseph R Pousson, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ready 4 A Change L L C
Represented By: Kendrick James Guidry
Represented By: Joseph R Pousson, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Velasco Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezequiel Gamez Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Joaquin Perez Corzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermina Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinica Victoria Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?