Youngblood v. Rain C I I Carbon L L C

Plaintiff: Douglas Trent Youngblood
Defendant: Rain C I I Carbon L L C
Case Number: 2:2012cv00287
Filed: January 25, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Amended Motion to Intervene; denying as moot 72 Motion to Intervene. The court grants the amended motion to intervene as to mover American Zurich. The motion is denied as to mover Louisiana Pigment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 06/04/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
January 23, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 33 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Douglas Trent Youngblood; DENYING IN PART, GRANTING IN PART 37 MOTION in Limine filed by Douglas Trent Youngblood; DENYING AS MOOT 49 MOTION for Hearing re 48 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures to Prove Negligence filed by Rain C I I Carbon L L C; GRANTING 48 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures to Prov e Negligence filed by Rain C I I Carbon L L C, DENYING AS MOOT 65 MOTION for Hearing re 37 MOTION in Limine ; DENYING AS MOOT 24 MOTION for Hearing re 18 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess of Twenty Five Pages with consent sought but not yet obtained filed by Rain C I I Carbon L L C. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/20/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 13, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 62 MOTION for Hearing re 61 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 36 MOTION to Strike 23 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, to Strike Declaration of David Rhoden filed by Rain C I I Carbon L L C, 36 MOTION to Strike 23 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Douglas Trent Youngblood. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/13/13. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 2, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Louisiana Pigment Co L P, and all claims against Louisiana Pigment are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 10/02/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youngblood v. Rain C I I Carbon L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rain C I I Carbon L L C
Represented By: Debra J Fischman
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Trent Youngblood
Represented By: W Taylor Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?