Cantu Services Inc v. Frazier et al

Plaintiff: Cantu Services Inc
Defendant: Melvin Lee Frazier, Louisiana Workforce Commission, Renee Ellender Roberie, Curt Eysink, Kevin Monk, Joseph Burton, Janell Bosarge and Mark S Martin
Case Number: 2:2012cv01292
Filed: May 18, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 280 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying as MOOT 271 Motion for Bill of Costs; denying as MOOT 273 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting in part and denying in part 248 Motion for Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED that attorney's fees be awarded to State Officials in the sum of $31,031.00. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 8/29/2016. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 21, 2016 227 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 195 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cantu Services Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/21/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 19, 2016 226 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 154 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 202 Daubert Motion; denying as moot 203 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/19/2016. (crt,Finn, P)
March 11, 2015 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 144 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melvin Lee Frazier. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/10/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
June 16, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint and Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction filed by Renee Ellender Roberie, Joseph Burton, Curt Eysink, Mark S Martin, Janell Bosarge, Kevin Monk is hereby GRANTED IN PART, and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 6/13/2014. (crt,Finn, P)
July 25, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion to Expedite; denying 86 Motion for Hearing; denying 86 Motion to Stay; denying 86 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 7/25/12. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantu Services Inc v. Frazier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cantu Services Inc
Represented By: Kevin R Donelson
Represented By: Edward J Fonti
Represented By: Bryan N B King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Lee Frazier
Represented By: Kurt D Duncan
Represented By: Corinne A Morrison
Represented By: Peter J Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Workforce Commission
Represented By: E Wade Shows
Represented By: Mary Ann McIntyre White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Ellender Roberie
Represented By: E Wade Shows
Represented By: Mary Ann McIntyre White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Eysink
Represented By: E Wade Shows
Represented By: Mary Ann McIntyre White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Monk
Represented By: E Wade Shows
Represented By: Mary Ann McIntyre White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Burton
Represented By: E Wade Shows
Represented By: Mary Ann McIntyre White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janell Bosarge
Represented By: E Wade Shows
Represented By: Mary Ann McIntyre White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S Martin
Represented By: E Wade Shows
Represented By: Mary Ann McIntyre White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?