Davis v. Granger et al

Plaintiff: Nolan C Davis, Sr
Defendant: Daniel Granger, Keith Cooley, Terry Terrell, Geo Group Inc, Burt Michot, Rodney Slay, Sandy McCain and Darren Scrugg
Case Number: 2:2012cv01746
Filed: June 18, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Allen
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2016 221 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the court GRANTS summary judgment sua sponte that LeBlanc is entitled to the Eleventh Amendment immunity for any claims against him and the 207 MOTION to Continue Trial filed by James M LeBlanc is no longer necessary as LeBlanc is dismissed as a defendant and thus the motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/8/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P)
April 15, 2015 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 142 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status. IT IS ORDERED that defendants Motion to Revoke Plaintiffs In Forma Pauperis Status [doc. #142] is GRANTED and the Order granting plaintiff in forma pauperi s status [doc. 8] is hereby REVOKED and RESCINDED;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff pay the full filing fee of $350.00 within forty-five (45) days from the date of this order, with credit for the amount that he has already paid. FAILURE TO PAY THE FULL FILING FEE WILL RESULT IN THIS CASE BEING STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/15/2015. (crt,HaikSld, K)
August 1, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 99 Report and Recommendations ; denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 07/31/2014. (crt,Benoit, J)
March 18, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 88 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 3/18/2014. (crt,Gregory, C)
October 21, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 70 Motion to Compel in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/21/2013. (crt,Gregory, C)
May 9, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: The order granting leave to amend (doc 32 ) is RESCINDED, and doc 30 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Nolan C Davis, Sr is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/9/2013. (crt,Gregory, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Granger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan C Davis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt Michot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Slay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Scrugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?