Botley v. Edwards et al

Plaintiff: Villmon Botley, Jr
Defendant: Richard Edwards, Jr, Derrick W Haught, Michael C Cassidy, Kevin D Millican, Terrie J Guillory, Donald Conner, Ryan Gary, John Kurtz, Steve Gunnell and Lance Clement
Case Number: 2:2012cv01789
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Jefferson Davis
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting 24 Report and Recommendations. The court notes that a judgment was signed and filed in this matter on February 28, 2014 which is duplicative of the judgment signed and filed on September 17, 2013, and therefore the Judgment of F ebruary 28, 2014 is hereby VACATED, the earlier judgment to remain in full force and effect. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff's civil rights action against John Kurtz is hereby dismissed for failure to comply with the court ord er 23 entered herein on January 10, 2014, in accordance with the provisions of FRCP Rule 41(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case be closed as John Kurtz is only remaining defendant in this case. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 03/11/14. (crt,Guillot, M) Modified on 3/11/2014 to edit text. (Guillot, M).
February 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 24 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's civil rights action as to all defendants EXCEPT defendant Kurtz, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, as frivolous and for failing to state a claim on which relief may b e granted pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). IT IS ALSO ORDERED that plaintiff's claim of excessive use of force be served upon defendant John Kurtz in accordance with the separate Memorandum Order issued by this court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall provide a copy of this order to the keeper of the three strikes list. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 02/28/14. (crt,Guillot, M)
September 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 13 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's civil rights action as to all defendants EXCEPT defendant Kurtz, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, as frivolous and for failing to state a claim on which relief may b e granted pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). IT IS ALSO ORDERED that plaintiff's claim of excessive use of force be served upon defendant John Kurtz in accordance with the separate Memorandum Order issued by this court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall provide a copy of this order to the keeper of the three strikes list. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 09/17/13. (crt,Guillot, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botley v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Villmon Botley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Edwards, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick W Haught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D Millican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrie J Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Gunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?