Guthrie et al v. Plains Resources Inc et al

Plaintiff: James Austin Guthrie and William Earl Guthrie
Defendant: Plains Resources Inc., Wiley P Ballard, Jr., Wiley P Ballard Estate, Jr, Robert A Mosbacher, Sr., Robert A Mosbacher Estate, Sr, Mosbacher Energy Company, Smith Production Co. of Mississippi and Premier Energy Partners. L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01904
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Cameron
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 81 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Demand of Smith Production Co of Mississippi, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Third Party Demand of Smith Production Co Mississippi filed by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co, St Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 8/10/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 2, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plains Resources Inc, Vulcan Energy Corp. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 9/4/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
June 7, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 37 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert A Mosbacher Estate, Sr, Mosbacher Energy Co. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 6/5/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 5, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 33 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by James Austin Guthrie, William Earl Guthrie; the magistrate judge's ruling denying the plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 2/5/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guthrie et al v. Plains Resources Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Austin Guthrie
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Earl Guthrie
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains Resources Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiley P Ballard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiley P Ballard Estate, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A Mosbacher, Sr.
Represented By: Bradley Duane Cousins
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Richard E Sarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A Mosbacher Estate, Sr
Represented By: Bradley Duane Cousins
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Richard E Sarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosbacher Energy Company
Represented By: Bradley Duane Cousins
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Richard E Sarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Production Co. of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Energy Partners. L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?