Wallace v. Geo Group Inc et al

Plaintiff: Rainey Wallace
Defendant: Geo Group Inc, Travis Weldon, Joshua Manuel, Trekuisek Lawrence and Brandon Loftin
Case Number: 2:2012cv02745
Filed: October 23, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Allen
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability filed by Rainey Wallace. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/19/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 13, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING 16 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim § 1983 Claims as to GEO filed by Geo Group Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/13/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 10, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 18 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/10/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Geo Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainey Wallace
Represented By: Roy H Maughan, Sr
Represented By: Charles A Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Group Inc
Represented By: Samuel B Gabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Weldon
Represented By: Samuel B Gabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Manuel
Represented By: Samuel B Gabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trekuisek Lawrence
Represented By: Joseph R Pousson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Loftin
Represented By: Joseph R Pousson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?