Roach v. Air Liquide America Corp LP et al

Plaintiff: Keith Roach
Defendant: Air Liquide America Corp LP, American Optical Corp, Bob Schmidt Inc, Clemco Industries Corp, Bacou-Dalloz U S A Inc, E D Bullard Co, Flexco Products Inc, Kelco Sales & Engineering Co, Louis M Gerson, Mine Safety Appliances Co, Moldex Metric Inc, Schmidt Manufacturing Inc, Survivair Inc, 3 M Co and Citgo Petroleum Corp
Case Number: 2:2012cv03165
Filed: December 28, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 188 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Optical Corp. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 7/11/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 28, 2016 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 154 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims against Citgo Petroleum Corporation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Court determines that there is no just reason for delay and hereby directs entry of final judgment under rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/28/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 11, 2016 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Axiall Corp. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/11/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 19, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 33 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Citgo Petroleum Corp. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/19/13. (crt,Roaix, G)
March 4, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Citgo Petroleum Corp. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 03/04/13. (crt,Guillot, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach v. Air Liquide America Corp LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Roach
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Liquide America Corp LP
Represented By: Justin Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corp
Represented By: Thomas R Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Schmidt Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemco Industries Corp
Represented By: R Dean Church, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacou-Dalloz U S A Inc
Represented By: Richard P Sulzer
Represented By: Robert E Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E D Bullard Co
Represented By: Jerald L Album
Represented By: Michael Thomas Wawrzycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexco Products Inc
Represented By: James V Woodsmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelco Sales & Engineering Co
Represented By: Marc B Johnson
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile Riggins
Represented By: Diane Michelle Sweezer
Represented By: Jennifer Dale Zajac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis M Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Co
Represented By: Lauren Fajoni Bartlett
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Edward T Hayes
Represented By: John R Peters, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moldex Metric Inc
Represented By: R Dean Church, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schmidt Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survivair Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 M Co
Represented By: Ryan M Malone
Represented By: Andrew D Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corp
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Sarah L Rubin
Represented By: Richard E Sarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?