Wright v. Excel Paralubes Inc et al

Plaintiff: Dustin Blake Wright
Defendant: Excel Paralubes Inc, Conoco Phillips Co Inc and Air Gas On-Site Safety Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv00365
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2017 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by International Enviroguard Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/31/17. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 10, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Revco Industries Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/10/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 3, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air Gas On-Site Safety Services Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 08/03/15. (crt,Tice, Y)
September 29, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Excel Paralubes, ConocoPhillips Co. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/29/14. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Excel Paralubes Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Blake Wright
Represented By: Charles Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Paralubes Inc
Represented By: Matthew Sanford Green
Represented By: James A Lochridge, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conoco Phillips Co Inc
Represented By: Matthew Sanford Green
Represented By: James A Lochridge, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Gas On-Site Safety Services Inc
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Brian Eugene Sevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?