Morris v. USA

Plaintiff: Melvin Morris
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2013cv02246
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Vernon
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 70 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by USA. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/13/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 29, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by USA. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/29/2015. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 14, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff is required to amend his complaint within 30 days from this date to specify his procedural capacity to act on behalf of the other plaintiffs named in the complaint other than himself. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 01/14/2015. (crt,Williams, L)
December 16, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 5 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/16/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Morris
Represented By: Paul Richard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?