Runnels v. Avoyelles Marksville Detention Center

Plaintiff: Donald Runnels
Defendant: Warden Avoyelles Marksville Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2014cv00503
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Avoyelles
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 142 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/31/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 4, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 102 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the defendant's petition for writ of habeas corpus IS DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as time-barred. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/2/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 18, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 38 Motion Writ of Audita Querela. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/18/2014. (crt,GregorySld, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runnels v. Avoyelles Marksville Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Avoyelles Marksville Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?