Ashford v. Aeroframe Services L L C et al

Plaintiff: Michael Ashford
Defendant: Aeroframe Services L L C and Aviation Technical Services Inc
Third_party_defendant: Roger A Porter
Cross_claimant: Aviation Technical Services Inc
Cross_defendant: Aeroframe Services L L C
Third_party_plaintiff: Aviation Technical Services Inc
Counter_claimant: Roger A Porter
Counter_defendant: Aviation Technical Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv00992
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Evangeline
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aviation Technical Services Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/23/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 14, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 02/14/17. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 4, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 48 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 45 Order on Motion to Remand, MOTION to Expedite filed by Michael Ashford, 50 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 45 Order on Motion to Remand,,,,, filed by Aeroframe Services L L C; the Memorandum Ruling 45 is AFFIRMED, IN PART, and REVERSED, IN PART, with the case remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in accordance with this opinion. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 4/17/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashford v. Aeroframe Services L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ashford
Represented By: Somer George Brown
Represented By: Thomas A Filo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeroframe Services L L C
Represented By: Joseph P Williams
Represented By: Richard Bray Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviation Technical Services Inc
Represented By: Phillip W DeVilbiss
Represented By: Heather Lindsey Kirk
Represented By: John R Pohorelsky
Represented By: R Patrick Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Roger A Porter
Represented By: Somer George Brown
Represented By: Thomas A Filo
Represented By: Richard Theodore Haik, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Aviation Technical Services Inc
Represented By: Phillip W DeVilbiss
Represented By: Heather Lindsey Kirk
Represented By: John R Pohorelsky
Represented By: R Patrick Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Aeroframe Services L L C
Represented By: Joseph P Williams
Represented By: Richard Bray Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Aviation Technical Services Inc
Represented By: Phillip W DeVilbiss
Represented By: Heather Lindsey Kirk
Represented By: John R Pohorelsky
Represented By: R Patrick Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Roger A Porter
Represented By: Thomas A Filo
Represented By: Richard Theodore Haik, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Aviation Technical Services Inc
Represented By: Phillip W DeVilbiss
Represented By: Heather Lindsey Kirk
Represented By: John R Pohorelsky
Represented By: R Patrick Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?