Harbor Docking and Towing Co L L C et al v. Rolls-Royce Marine North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C and Point Comfort Towing Inc
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Marine North America Inc, Caterpillar Inc, Castleman Maritime L L C, Main Iron Works L L C, Atain Specialty Insurance Co, A J K Holdings L L C and S K F U S A Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv02487
Filed: August 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Referring Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 14th Judicial District Court. (crt,Benoit, T)
November 19, 2014 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM RULING re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by Point Comfort Towing Inc, Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on November 19,2 014. For the reason stated, plaintiffs' motion to remand is GRANTED. The effect of this ruling is stayed for a period of fourteen (14) days to allow any aggrieved party an opportunity to see review from the district cout. If no review if timely sought then the clerk is instructed to remand to the court form which this matter came. (crt,Benoit, T)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Leah R Rhodes terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/4/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
October 29, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Sarah Murphy Barro in Place of Leah R Rhodes by Atain Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Sarah Murphy Barro added to party Atain Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Barro, Sarah) Modified on 10/29/2014 to edit text and correct motion event (Dauterive, C).
October 29, 2014 Filing 36 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Sarah Murphy Barro to Enroll as Counsel by A J K Holdings L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Sarah Murphy Barro added to party A J K Holdings L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Barro, Sarah) Modified on 10/29/2014 to reflect "Filed in Error"; counsel corrected and refiled as document #37 (Dauterive, C).
October 29, 2014 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Sarah Murphy Barro regarding #36 MOTION for Sarah Murphy Barro to Enroll as Counsel on behalf of A J K Holdings L L C. Action taken: Modified docket entry to reflect "Filed in Error"; counsel corrected and refiled as #37 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Sarah Murphy Barro in Place of Leah R Rhodes on behalf of Atain Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 10, 2014 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C, Point Comfort Towing Inc. (aty,Middleton, Troy)
October 3, 2014 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Monson, Matthew)
September 30, 2014 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by Caterpillar Inc. (aty,McNeil, Adam)
September 16, 2014 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Point Comfort Towing Inc identifying Corporate Parent Harbor Services, LLC for Point Comfort Towing Inc. (aty,Middleton, Troy)
September 16, 2014 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C identifying Corporate Parent Harbor Services, LLC for Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C. (aty,Middleton, Troy)
September 15, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding #29 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (crt,Kennedy, T)
September 12, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION to Remand by Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C, Point Comfort Towing Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Middleton, Troy)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/9/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
September 8, 2014 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atain Specialty Insurance Co improperly named as A J K Holdings L L C. (aty,Monson, Matthew) Modified filer on 9/9/2014 (Kennedy, T).
September 8, 2014 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Atain Specialty Insurance Co incorrectly named as A J K Holdings L L C.(aty,Monson, Matthew) Modified filer on 9/9/2014 (Kennedy, T).
September 5, 2014 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (and Defenses) by Rolls-Royce Marine North America Inc.(aty,Bowdler, Bryan)
September 4, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Curry & Friend, PLC in place of Preis, PLC with consent sought but not yet obtained by Castleman Maritime L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(aty,Finkle, Ezra)
September 4, 2014 Filing 23 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #7 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Leah R Rhodes on behalf of A J K Holdings L L C. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2014. (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
August 26, 2014 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rolls-Royce Marine North America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Rolls-Royce Group, PLC for Rolls-Royce Marine North America Inc. (aty,Riviere, William)
August 25, 2014 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Caterpillar Inc . (aty,McNeil, Adam)
August 25, 2014 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Main Iron Works L L C.(aty,Rayer, Thomas)
August 20, 2014 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C, Point Comfort Towing Inc. Rolls-Royce Marine North America Inc served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014. (aty,Middleton, Troy)
August 20, 2014 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C, Point Comfort Towing Inc. Main Iron Works L L C served on 7/9/2014, answer due 7/30/2014. (aty,Middleton, Troy)
August 20, 2014 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Castleman Maritime L L C.(aty,Finkle, Ezra)
August 20, 2014 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Caterpillar Inc.(aty,McNeil, Adam)
August 20, 2014 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by S K F U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent AB SKF for S K F U S A Inc. (aty,Glass, Joseph)
August 20, 2014 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by S K F U S A Inc.(aty,Glass, Joseph)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. IT IS ORDERED that defendant, AJK Holdings, LLC, is hereby granted an additional twenty (20) days within which to answer or otherwise file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/19/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on August 18, 2014. (crt,Benoit, T)
August 18, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by A J K Holdings L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rhodes, Leah)
August 15, 2014 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Castleman Maritime L L C. (aty,Finkle, Ezra)
August 15, 2014 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caterpillar Inc . (aty,McNeil, Adam) Modified text on 8/15/2014 (Kennedy, T).
August 14, 2014 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Main Iron Works L L C. (aty,Rayer, Thomas)
August 14, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Leah R Rhodes, Matthew D Monson on behalf of AJK Holdings, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2014. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Thomas A Rayer, Jr, Thomas J Wagner on behalf of Main Iron Works, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2014. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Ezra Lavi Finkle on behalf of Castleman Maritime, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2014. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Adam C McNeil, Deirdre C McGlinchey, Benjamin O Schupp on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2014. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Andrew D Weinstock, Joseph G Glass on behalf of SKF USA, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2014. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to William J Riviere, Bryan Edward Bowdler, Meredith W Blanque on behalf of Rolls-Royce Marine North America, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2014. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 13, 2014 CASE Assigned to Judge Patricia Minaldi and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 13, 2014 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. SKF USA, Inc. answer due 8/20/2014. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 13, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu, Case Number 2014-2579 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2591059) filed by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Adam C McNeil added to party Caterpillar, Inc. (pty:dft))(aty,McNeil, Adam)
August 13, 2014 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed: AJK Holdings, LLC answer due 8/20/2014; Castleman Maritime, LLC answer due 8/20/2014; Caterpillar, Inc. answer due 8/20/2014. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbor Docking and Towing Co L L C et al v. Rolls-Royce Marine North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Marine North America Inc
Represented By: William J Riviere
Represented By: Bryan Edward Bowdler
Represented By: Meredith W Blanque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Benjamin O Schupp
Represented By: Deirdre C McGlinchey
Represented By: Adam C McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleman Maritime L L C
Represented By: Ezra Lavi Finkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Iron Works L L C
Represented By: Thomas J Wagner
Represented By: Thomas A Rayer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atain Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Donald John Latuso, Jr
Represented By: Sarah Murphy Barro
Represented By: Leah R Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew D Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A J K Holdings L L C
Represented By: Donald John Latuso, Jr
Represented By: Sarah Murphy Barro
Represented By: Leah R Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew D Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S K F U S A Inc
Represented By: Andrew D Weinstock
Represented By: Joseph G Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbor Docking & Towing Co L L C
Represented By: Hunter W Lundy
Represented By: Troy Houston Middleton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Point Comfort Towing Inc
Represented By: Hunter W Lundy
Represented By: Troy Houston Middleton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?