Gary et al v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C et al

Plaintiff: Laura Gary and Randy Gary
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C and Coca Cola Bottling Co United Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv03131
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on May 10, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
March 23, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Coca Cola Bottling Co United Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/21/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P)
May 4, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING 16 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Party Complaint of Coca-Cola Bottling Company United Inc For Failure to State a Claim filed by True Manufacturing Co Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 4/17/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary et al v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gary
Represented By: Rex D Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Gary
Represented By: Rex D Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: David J Calogero
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca Cola Bottling Co United Inc
Represented By: Matthew W Bailey
Represented By: Kimberly Louper Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?