Brown et al v. Alcoa Inc et al

Plaintiff: Paul Brown, Phyllis Brown, Patrick Ardoin, Yvette Ardoin, Bruce E Baugh, Frederick Davis Bennerscheidt, Katherine Bennerscheidt, Bentley Berlin, Tisa A Berlin, Misty Berlin, Wesley Berlin, Ronald J Bordelon, Jackie R Bordelon, Troy Derouen, Andrew Bailey Fontenot, Randal K Jarrell, Robin H Jarrell, Clyde J Lambert, Nancy Lambert, Rena Dale Hannum Lejeune, Randal C Liprie, Deonna Liprie, James McGee, Sandra McGee, Cynthia Ann Reed, Bruce E Treadway, Wendell Lee Lejeune and All Plaintiffs
Defendant: Alcoa Inc and Reynolds Metals Co
Case Number: 2:2014cv03534
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING the 48 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 47 Memorandum Ruling. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 7/25/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 1, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 12 Motion to Remand in all respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/1/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 26, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon further reflection on 31 Memorandum Order which remanded this matter to the undersigned to determine if the amount in controversy is satisfied, and reconsidering the courts 40 Order allowing the parties to submit evidence as to the am ount in controversy, we hereby RESCIND the 40 Order. IT IS ORDERED that the 40 Order issued by this court on 10/14/2015 is hereby RESCINDED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants may submit a brief on the issue of jurisdiction on or before 11/23/2015 and any opposition may be submitted on or before 12/3/2015. A reply brief may be submitted on or before 12/10/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/26/2015. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Alcoa Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Brown
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Brown
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ardoin
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Ardoin
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E Baugh
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Davis Bennerscheidt
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Bennerscheidt
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bentley Berlin
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisa A Berlin
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Berlin
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Berlin
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Bordelon
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie R Bordelon
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Derouen
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bailey Fontenot
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal K Jarrell
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin H Jarrell
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde J Lambert
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lambert
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rena Dale Hannum Lejeune
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal C Liprie
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deonna Liprie
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGee
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra McGee
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ann Reed
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E Treadway
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Lee Lejeune
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Represented By: Kenneth Jay DeLouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcoa Inc
Represented By: Thomas E Birsic
Represented By: David J Kiefer
Represented By: Kerry J Miller
Represented By: James R Parish
Represented By: Andrew R Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Metals Co
Represented By: Thomas E Birsic
Represented By: David J Kiefer
Represented By: Kerry J Miller
Represented By: James R Parish
Represented By: Andrew R Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?