Louisiana United Businesses Association Casualty Insurance Co v. J & J Maintenance Inc et al

Plaintiff: Louisiana United Businesses Association Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: J & J Maintenance Inc, A B C Insurance, Entergy Louisiana L L C, D E F Insurance, Volvo Construction Equipment Rents Inc, G H I Insurance and Pride Industries
Case Number: 2:2015cv01769
Filed: May 27, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Vernon
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Entergy Louisiana L L C; granting 63 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Plaintiff's Expert filed by Entergy Louisiana L L C; denying 70 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment against Entergy Louisiana, LLC filed by Louisiana United Businesses Association Casualty Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on October 19, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
October 13, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 67 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Third Party Demand of Defendant, J&J Maintenance, Inc. filed by Travelers Indemnity Co of America. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on October 13, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 24, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Before the court is a 14 Motion to Remand filed by plaintiff Louisiana United Business Association Casualty Insurance Co in response to the 1 Notice of Removal filed on 5/07/2015 by defendant Pride Industries. Pride opposes the motion to remand, and is joined by other defendants, Migues Deloach Co, Entergy Louisiana L L C, and J & J Maintenance Inc. For the reasons stated herein, the plaintiff's 14 Motion to Remand is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/24/2015. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana United Businesses Association Casualty Insurance Co v. J & J Maintenance Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana United Businesses Association Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Doris Theresa Bobadilla
Represented By: Christie Laporte Tournet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Maintenance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Louisiana L L C
Represented By: R O'Neal Chadwick, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Brent Odom, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D E F Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Construction Equipment Rents Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth M Carmody
Represented By: Sidney Earl Cook, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G H I Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride Industries
Represented By: William Henry Priestley, Jr
Represented By: Scott L Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?