Sims v. Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: Gary Sims
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Melissa Ross, Dawn Sahula, Ann Ellender, Allison Weckerly, Nick Pizzolatto, Brandon Fullilove and Jessica Prudhomme White
Case Number: 2:2015cv02466
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 13 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the claims filed in this action against Jessica Prudhomme White be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 3/26/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 3, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 12 Amended Complaint filed by Gary Sims: Within thirty (30) days after service of this order, SIMS IS DIRECTED to complete two summons forms and one USM-285 form for each defendant, attach each set of documents to a copy of the original complaint, and send those packets of documents (one packet per defendant) to the: Deputy Clerk of Court, United States Courthouse, 611 Broad Street, Lake Charles, LA 70601. THE CLERK IS FURTHER DIRECTED to provide the prepared packets to the United States Marshal for service on the defendant identified in the summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/3/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 20, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Gary Sims. Gary Sims is allowed thirty (30) days within which he may seek representation for his child. Should no attorney move to enroll as counsel for the minor child we will issue a Report and R ecommendation to the district court suggesting the claim should be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff amend his complaint with respect to his own claims only within thirty (30) days of the filing of this order to cure the d eficiencies as outlined in this order, and alternatively, dismiss the claims he is unable to cure through amendment. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) or under Rule 41(b) or 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/19/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Sahula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Ellender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Weckerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Pizzolatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Fullilove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Prudhomme White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?