Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C v. W G Yates & Sons Construction Co

Plaintiff: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Defendant: W G Yates & Sons Construction Co
Counter_claimant: W G Yates & Sons Construction Co
Counter_defendant: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Case Number: 2:2015cv02751
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2017 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 142 MOTION to Dismiss 120 Dannix Plainting L L C's Cross-Claim filed by Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 8/9/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 15, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on the prior Judgment of this Court dated and entered March 8, 2016, it appearing to the Court that there is no just reason for delay in entering a final appealable judgment on the aforesaid decision, pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 54(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a final appealable judgment be entered herein on this aforesaid decision 38 . Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/15/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 8, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 9 MOTION to Partially Dismiss Yates' Counterclaim For Failure to State a Claim filed by Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 3/8/16. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C v. W G Yates & Sons Construction Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Represented By: Gregory E Bodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W G Yates & Sons Construction Co
Represented By: Daniel J Caruso
Represented By: Luke Patrick LaRocca
Represented By: H Alan McCall
Represented By: William B Monk
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: H Bruce Shreves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: W G Yates & Sons Construction Co
Represented By: Daniel J Caruso
Represented By: Luke Patrick LaRocca
Represented By: H Alan McCall
Represented By: William B Monk
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: H Bruce Shreves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Represented By: Gregory E Bodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?