Brand Energy Solutions L L C v. Gilley

Plaintiff: Brand Energy Solutions L L C
Defendant: Cody Gilley
Case Number: 2:2016cv01025
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 30 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Cody Gilley's First Amended Counterclaim filed by Brand Energy Solutions L L C. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 2/22/17. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 18, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cody Gilley. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/18/17. (crt,Roaix, G)
October 14, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is granted to the extent that the court finds the Absentees are indispensable parties which must be joined in this lawsuit. Plaintiff shall amend complaint to in clude the indispensable parties no later than thirty days from the date of this order; failure to comply will result in dismissal of the instant lawsuit; otherwise, the motion to dismiss the complaint is hereby denied. Oral argument currently scheduled for 10/26/206 is hereby canceled. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/14/2016. (crt,ThomasSld, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand Energy Solutions L L C v. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brand Energy Solutions L L C
Represented By: Elvige Cassard
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Englander
Represented By: Barham Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Gilley
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr
Represented By: Edward J Laperouse, II
Represented By: John Anthony Milazzo
Represented By: John A Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?