USA v. Kees et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Bruce Kees, Chester Arthur Cormier and Brenda Sue Cormier
Case Number: 2:2016cv01180
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINAL JUDGMENT denying 23 Motion to Set Aside Default, 18 Renewed Motion of the United States for Entry of Default Judgment against Bruce C Kees is granted, United States shall have judgment in its favor and against Bruce C Kees in the total amount of $401,356.74, and unpaid balances of two penalties in the total amount of $1,898.46, Subject Property to be sold. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/28/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM RULING re 18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bruce C. Kees filed by USA. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/15/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT Adopting 13 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Denying 10 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. The motion is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to re-urge the motion if it can correct the deficiencies outlined in Magistrate Judge Kay's report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/18/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Kees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert E Dozier
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Arthur Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Sue Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?