Harper v. Academy of Training School, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Bennett Harper
Defendant: Academy of Training School L L C and Progressive Buildings L L C
Case Number: 2:2016cv01266
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM RULING denying 20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/16/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM RULING denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration re 25 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/13/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 16 Motion to Compel, subject to defendants' obligation to produce the time sheets if they are located. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/9/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Academy of Training School, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy of Training School L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Buildings L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Bennett Harper
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?