Paramount Co 2 L L C et al v. Reynolds & Reynolds Co
Plaintiff: Paramount Nissan, Paramount Company 3, LLC, Paramount Company 4, LLC, Paramount Company 2, LLC, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C and Paramount Co 2 L L C
Defendant: Reynolds and Reynolds and Reynolds & Reynolds Co
Case Number: 2:2018cv01132
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 23, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
October 23, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 22, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order) See Record Doc. #22 for proposed sealed Exhibits B - H(crt,Keifer, K)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Seal at this time. Defendants are granted until 11/5/2018 to file an amended motion that clearly articulates a specific and compelling reason why each document or portion thereof needs to remain sealed. This order has no effect on the Motion to Compel Arbitration, which remains pending. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/22/2018. (crt,Keifer, K)
October 19, 2018 Filing 23 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrected Memorandum in Support w/ EXHIBIT I filed by Reynolds & Reynolds Co Correcting to add Exhibit I to Motion to Compel Arbitration (page 10) filed this day. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I to Motion to Compel Arbitration, omitted from previous filing)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 10/22/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits to Motion to Compel filed herewith by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order granting unopposed Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Exhibit A to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Exhibit B to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #5 Exhibit C to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #6 Exhibit D to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #7 Exhibit E to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #8 Exhibit F to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #9 Exhibit G to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #10 Exhibit H to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #11 Notice of Submission, #12 Proposed order granting Motion to Compel Arbitration)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 10/22/2018 to Seal Proposed Exhibits pending Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, to remove additional motion event selected in error, and to indicate Corrected Memorandum in Support w/ Exhibit I filed as document #23 (Dauterive, C).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of John C Allen for Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/16/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for John C. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3778809) by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Dumestre, Mary)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 Amended Complaint, Reynolds & Reynolds Co answer due 10/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/10/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint, with consent by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Farris, Abigayle)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Compel Arbitration; granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant is granted until 10/19/2018 to re-urge its motion to compel arbitration in light of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/3/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 3, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support with consent. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support with consent by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Farris, Abigayle)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Reynolds & Reynolds Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(aty,Farris, Abigayle)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Counterclaim by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C and Paramount Nissan L L C.(aty,King, William) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support filed by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,King, William)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reynolds & Reynolds Co filed by Paramount Nissan L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 2 L L C.(Attorney William Spencer King added to party Paramount Co 3 L L C(pty:pla), Attorney William Spencer King added to party Paramount Co 3 L L C(pty:cd))(aty,King, William) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reynolds & Reynolds Co identifying Corporate Parent Dealer Computer Services Inc. (aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified to edit docket text on 9/20/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. (aty,Dumestre, Mary)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Crick, S)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Sheri Robinson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Agreement Paramount 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Service Agreement Paramount 3, #4 Exhibit 4 - Service Agreement Paramount 4, #5 Exhibit 5 - Service Agreement Paramount Nissan, #6 Exhibit 6 - Service of Process)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 9/4/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Petition for Declaratory Judgment and Damages, COUNTERCLAIM against Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C by Reynolds & Reynolds Co.(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 9/5/2018 to modify docket text and create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
September 4, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Crick, S)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/31/2018. (crt,LaCombe, L)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Abigayle Clary McDowell Farris, Mary L Dumestre on behalf of Reynolds and Reynolds. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/13/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Reynolds and Reynolds Co. (aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 8/31/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Adverse Parties re #1 Notice of Removal by Reynolds and Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 8/31/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14 JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2018002998 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3741466) filed by Reynolds and Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Civil cover sheet Civill Cover Sheet)(Attorney Mary L Dumestre added to party Reynolds and Reynolds(pty:dft))(aty,Dumestre, Mary)
August 30, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Reynolds and Reynolds answer due 9/6/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 30, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paramount Co 2 L L C et al v. Reynolds & Reynolds Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Nissan
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Company 3, LLC
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Company 4, LLC
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Company 2, LLC
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Co 3 L L C
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Nissan L L C
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Co 4 L L C
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Co 2 L L C
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds and Reynolds
Represented By: Mary L Dumestre
Represented By: Abigayle Clary McDowell Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds & Reynolds Co
Represented By: Mary L Dumestre
Represented By: Abigayle Clary McDowell Farris
Represented By: John C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?