Sinegal v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Anastasia Sinegal
Defendant: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C, Mallory Bellard, Officer Ewing, Police Dept City of Lake Charles, Corporal Jackson, Chief Don Dixon, Princeton Jackson, Joshua Ewing and Donald Dixon
Case Number: 2:2018cv01143
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY REFERRING MOTION: #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim are referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay for Report and Recommendation. Issued by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 10/25/2018. (crt,Reeves, T)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent to Receive Notice and Service Electronically by Anastasia Sinegal (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Donald Dixon, Joshua Ewing, Princeton Jackson and Police Dept City of Lake Charles. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,John, Christopher) Modified on 10/23/2018 to edit text and correct filers (Dauterive, C).
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Don Dixon, Donald Dixon, Ewing, Joshua Ewing, Jackson, Princeton Jackson, Police Dept City of Lake Charles.(aty,John, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Complaint sent to Ashley Dawnise Boutte on behalf of Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/24/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Mallory Bellard, Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mallory Bellard, Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C.(Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Mallory Bellard(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/26/2018. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Donald Dixon answer due 11/29/2018; Ewing answer due 11/29/2018; Princeton Jackson answer due 11/29/2018; Police Dept City of Lake Charles answer due 11/29/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/25/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by Don Dixon, Ewing, Jackson, Police Dept City of Lake Charles. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Conference, #2 Proposed order Order)(Attorney Christopher E John added to party Don Dixon(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher E John added to party Ewing(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher E John added to party Jackson(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher E John added to party Police Dept City of Lake Charles(pty:dft))(aty,John, Christopher) Modified on 9/21/2018 to edit filers (Williams, L).
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mallory Bellard, Don Dixon, Ewing, Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C, Jackson, Police Dept City of Lake Charles (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 31, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mallory Bellard, Don Dixon, Ewing, Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C, Jackson, Police Dept City of Lake Charles with Jury Demand (Receipt number 24635-002556, filing fee $400) filed by Anastasia Sinegal. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinegal v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Represented By: Ashley Dawnise Boutte
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallory Bellard
Represented By: Ashley Dawnise Boutte
Represented By: Christopher P Ieyoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ewing
Represented By: Christopher E John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept City of Lake Charles
Represented By: Christopher E John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Jackson
Represented By: Christopher E John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Don Dixon
Represented By: Christopher E John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Jackson
Represented By: Christopher E John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Ewing
Represented By: Christopher E John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Dixon
Represented By: Christopher E John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Sinegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?