Warner v. Talos E R T L L C et al
Plaintiff: Anika Warner, as Guardian of Y.J., a Minor Child and Anika Warner
Defendant: DIVERSE SAFETY AND SCAFFOLDING, LLC, TALOS ERT, LLC, Talos E R T L L C and Diverse Safety & Scaffolding L L C
Case Number: 2:2018cv01435
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Talos E R T L L C identifying Corporate Parent Talos Production L L C, Corporate Parent Talos Energy Inc. (aty,King, William) Modified to add corporate parents on 12/26/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to George B Jurgens, III on behalf of Talos E R T L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/4/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Talos E R T L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney George B Jurgens, III added to party Talos E R T L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Jurgens, George)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anika Warner. Diverse Safety & Scaffolding L L C served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (aty,Findley, Jonathan)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anika Warner. Talos E R T L L C served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (aty,Findley, Jonathan)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diverse Safety & Scaffolding L L C, Talos E R T L L C (crt,Crick, S)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diverse Safety & Scaffolding L L C, Talos E R T L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3797144) filed by Anika Warner. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jonathan Kyle Findley added to party Anika Warner (pty:pla))(aty,Findley, Jonathan) Modified to edit docket text on 11/2/2018 (ThomasSld, T). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/5/2018 to remove fillable form.) (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Talos E R T L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVERSE SAFETY AND SCAFFOLDING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALOS ERT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talos E R T L L C
Represented By: George B Jurgens, III
Represented By: William Spencer King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diverse Safety & Scaffolding L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Warner, as Guardian of Y.J., a Minor Child
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Warner
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Findley
Represented By: Michael K Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?