Gonzalez v. Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Plaintiff: Hugo Gonzalez
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corp U S A
Consolidated Plaintiff: Jeremy Eades, Courtney Alston, Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Cortney Blair Alston and Lauren M Outlaw-Knight
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Francene Henderson and Daniel Henderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00130
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ANSWER to #103 Counterclaim by Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight.(aty,Young, Timothy) Modified on 3/12/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ANSWER to #102 Counterclaim by Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight).(aty,Young, Timothy) Modified on 3/12/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ANSWER to #101 Counterclaim by Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight.(aty,Young, Timothy) Modified on 3/12/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FILED IN ERROR. ANSWER to 101 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Galloway Outlaw-Knight and by Hugo Gonzalez.(aty,Young, Timothy) Modified on 3/11/2019 to indicate filed in error. Counsel will resubmit document. (Crick, S).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Corrective Action to Timothy J Young on behalf of Hugo Gonzalez((R. Doc. 33)), Galloway Outlaw-Knight((R. Doc. 33)) regarding #107 Answer to Counterclaim,. Action taken: Terminated #107 Answer to Counterclaim. Counsel will resubmit. (crt,Crick, S)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ANSWER to #103 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, of Yamaha Motor Corporation by Cortney Blair Alston.(aty,Stanga, Alonzo)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ANSWER to #102 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, of Yamaha Motor Corporation by Cortney Blair Alston.(aty,Stanga, Alonzo)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ANSWER to #101 Counterclaim by Cortney Blair Alston.(aty,Stanga, Alonzo) Modified on 3/1/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson, COUNTERCLAIM against Cortney Blair Alston, Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight by Yamaha Motor Corp U S A.(aty,Glass, Joseph) Modified on 2/21/2019 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ANSWER to #84 Supplemental and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand,CROSSCLAIM against Francene Henderson, Daniel Henderson, COUNTERCLAIM against Cortney Blair Alston, Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight by Yamaha Motor Corp U S A.(aty,Glass, Joseph) Modified on 2/21/2019 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Francene Henderson, Daniel Henderson, COUNTERCLAIM against Cortney Blair Alston, Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight by Yamaha Motor Corp U S A.(Attorney Joseph G Glass added to party Yamaha Motor Corp U S A(pty:dft))(aty,Glass, Joseph) Modified on 2/21/2019 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Corrective Action to David R Frohn on behalf of Sea Fox Boat Co Inc regarding #96 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement. Action taken: Terminated #96 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Due. #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement submitted at #14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. (crt,Crick, S)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ANSWER to #84 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sea Fox Boat Co Inc.(aty,Senter, Meghan)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ANSWER to #78 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sea Fox Boat Co Inc.(aty,Senter, Meghan)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/5/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ISSUED IN ERROR. NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #2 Complaint, sent to David R Frohn, Meghan Brianne Senter on behalf of Sea Fox Boat Co Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/19/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M) Modified on 2/19/2019 to indicate issued in error. See #14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. (Crick, S).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-07711. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER AND REASONS: Case transferred to USDC Western District of Louisiana, Lake Charles Division. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/1/19.(Reference: 18-7711, 18-7832, 18-7887)(sbs) (Case Transferred via Case Extraction) Modified on 2/1/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Reference: 18-7711, 18-7887)(Young, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re #89 Request/Statement of Oral Argument as to the #73 MOTION to Transfer Case; The Court declines to schedule oral argument at this time. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/29/2019.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #88 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #89 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. **Filing attorney did not select Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight and Galloway Outlaw-Knight as filers. Clerk added filers.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cortney Blair Alston re #73 MOTION to Transfer Case Adopting responses to Docs 88 and 89. (Reference: 18-7832)(Zelbst, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Hugo Gonzalez, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight, Galloway Outlaw-Knight regarding #73 MOTION to Transfer Case. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-7711; 18-7887)(Young, Timothy) Modified filers on 1/30/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Hugo Gonzalez, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight, Galloway Outlaw-Knight re #73 MOTION to Transfer Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 18-7711; 18-7887)(Young, Timothy) Modified filers on 1/30/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Summons Issued as to Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. (Reference: 18-7711, 18-7887)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Request of Summons Issued as to Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. filed by Hugo Gonzalez re #2 Complaint, #71 Amended Complaint, #72 Amended Complaint. (Reference: 18-7711, 18-7887)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Summons Issued as to Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A.(18-7832). (Reference: 18-7832)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.(18-7832), Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. filed by Cortney Blair Alston.(Reference: 18-7832)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/28/19. (Reference: 18-7832)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Cortney Blair Alston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 18-7832)(Zelbst, John) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #79 Answer to Complaint, #80 Answer to Complaint. **Answers should have been linked to the appropriate complaints by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking each Answer to the appropriate Complaint.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ANSWER to #71 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.(Reference: 18-7711)(Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.(Reference: 18-7887)(Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.(18-7832) filed by Cortney Blair Alston.(Reference: 18-7832)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/24/19. (Reference: 18-7832)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #75 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Motion for Leave to File Document.' Clerk took corrective action by changing the event and modifying the docket text. ALSO, documents do not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must include Magistrate 5.** (Reference: 18-7832)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Cortney Blair Alston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 18-7832)(Zelbst, John) Modified event and text on 1/24/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #73 MOTION to Transfer Case. **Filing attorney should have entered Submission Date and selected the correct hearing Judge. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 2/6/19before Judge Africk. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Transfer Case by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. Motion(s) submitted on 2/06/2019.(Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 1/22/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. filed by Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight.(Reference: 18-7887)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. filed by Hugo Gonzalez.(Reference: 18-7711)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; FURTHER ORDERED that the scheduling conference currently set for 1/15/2019 is CANCELLED, to be reset once the newly added defendant, Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A., makes its appearance. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/14/2019. (Reference: 18-7711, 18-7887)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaints by Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 18-7711, 18-7887)(Young, Timothy) Modified text and filers on 1/14/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney David R. Frohn and Meghan B. Senter for Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. Attorney David J. Saltaformaggio; James Grady Wyly, III; Autumn Taylor Breeden and Evans Martin McLeod terminated. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/7/2019. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Counsel David R. Frohn and Meghan B. Senter to be substituted in place of James Grady Wyly, III, Autumn Taylor Breeden, David J. Saltaformaggio, and Evans Martin McLeod by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Senter, Meghan) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ANSWER to #33 Third Party Complaint by Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson.(Reference: 18-7711)(Buck, Thomas) Modified text on 12/31/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting in part #62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 Third Party Complaint. Responsive pleadings shall be filed no later than 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/21/18. (Reference: 18-7711)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #62 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 Third Party Complaint. **Filing attorney should have linked the motion to the Third Party Complaint by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking the motion to the Third Party Complaint.**. (Reference: 18-7711)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 Third Party Complaint, by Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Reference: 18-7711) Attorney Thomas Glenn Buck added to party Daniel Henderson(pty:3pd), Francene Henderson (pty:3pd).(Buck, Thomas) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ANSWER to #35 Counterclaim by Cortney Blair Alston.(Reference: 18-7832)(Zelbst, John) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint by Cortney Blair Alston.(Reference: 18-7887)(Zelbst, John) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ANSWER to #33 Third Party Complaint by Cortney Blair Alston.(Reference: 18-7711)(Zelbst, John) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Substitute Party. Cortney Blair Alston shall be substituted as plaintiff for Jeremy Eades in her capacity as the administratrix of Jeremy Eades's estate. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/18/2018. (Reference: 18-7832)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party Cortney Blair Alston, as Administratrix of the Estate of Jeremy Wade Eades, deceased to be substituted in place of Jeremy Eades by Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-7832)(Zelbst, John) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #55 Answer to Counterclaim. **Filing has been marked as a duplicate to R. Doc. 49 and will be noted as such. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 18-7711)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 **DUPLICATE FILING. SEE R. DOC. 49** ANSWER to #33 Counterclaim by Hugo Gonzalez.(Reference: 18-7711)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ANSWER to #35 Third Party Complaint by Galloway Outlaw-Knight.(Reference: 18-7832)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ANSWER to #34 Counterclaim by Galloway Outlaw-Knight.(Reference: 18-7887)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to #33 Third Party Complaint by Galloway Outlaw-Knight.(Reference: 18-7711)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ANSWER to #35 Third Party Complaint by Hugo Gonzalez.(Reference: 18-7832)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint by Hugo Gonzalez.(Reference: 18-7887)Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Hugo Gonzalez(pty:con3df).(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ANSWER to #33 Counterclaim by Hugo Gonzalez.(Reference: 18-7711)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Francene Henderson served on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Reference: 18-7111, 18-7832, 18-7887)(Saltaformaggio, David) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Francene Henderson served on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Reference: 18-7111, 18-7832, 18-7887)(Saltaformaggio, David) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Francene Henderson served on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Reference: 18-7111, 18-7832, 18-7887)(Saltaformaggio, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Daniel Henderson served on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Reference: 18-7111, 18-7832, 18-7887)(Saltaformaggio, David) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Daniel Henderson served on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Reference: 18-7711, 18-7832, 18-7887)(Saltaformaggio, David) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Daniel Henderson served on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018.(Reference: 18-7111, 18-7832, 18-7887)(Saltaformaggio, David) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Jeremy Eades; Responsive pleadings to the counterclaim and third-party claims shall be filed no later than 12/20/2018. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/15/2018. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 Third Party Complaint, #34 Third Party Complaint, #35 Counterclaim. **Document does not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge 5.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 Third Party Complaint, #34 Third Party Complaint, #35 Counterclaim, by Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases) Attorney John Paul Zelbst added to party Jeremy Eades(pty:con3df)(Zelbst, John) Modified text on 11/15/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED that the Call Docket set for 11/14/2018 is SATISFIED AND CANCELLED, counsel need not appear. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/13/2018.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Reference: 18-7711, 18-7832, 18-7887)(Saltaformaggio, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2018 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson, COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Jeremy Eades by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.(Reference: 18-7832)(McLeod, Evans) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hugo Gonzalez, Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson, Jeremy Eades, COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Galloway Outlaw-Knight by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.(Reference: 18-7887)(McLeod, Evans) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jeremy Eades, Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Francene Henderson, Daniel Henderson, COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Hugo Gonzalez by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.(Reference: 18-7711)(McLeod, Evans) Modified on 11/2/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Docket Call set for 11/14/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/29/2018.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Allen Austin Vollor. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/23/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Atty) (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Allen Austin Vollor (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7187197). **The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document. Also, the case reference in the docket text must match the case reference listed on the document. Please follow this requirement on all future filings. Clerk modified the docket text. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Allen Austin Vollor (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7187197) by Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 ECF Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases) (Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney David J. Saltaformaggio, Autumn Taylor Breeden, Evans Martin McLeod for Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/2/18. (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #26 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.' Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (Reference: 18-7832)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades dismissing Courtney Alston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-7832)(Zelbst, John) Modified event on 10/2/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #24 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record. **The case reference in the docket text must match the case reference listed on the document. Please follow this requirement on all future filings. Clerk modified the docket text to read 'All Cases'. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Wyly, James) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by James Grady Wyly, III on behalf of Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Reference: 18-7832, 18-7887)(Wyly, James) Modified text on 10/1/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Substitute Attorney. David R. Frohn and Meghan B. Senter are WITHDRAWN, and James G. Wyly is ENROLLED as counsel of record for Sea Fox in connection with this matter. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/26/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Motion to Substitute Attorney.' Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James G. Wyly to be substituted in place of David R. Frohn and Meghan B. Senter by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases) (sbs) Modified event and text on 9/26/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 **DEFICIENT** MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Unopposed, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/24/2009. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 18-7711)(Wyly, James) Modified text on 9/25/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by James Grady Wyly, III on behalf of Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Reference: 18-7711) Attorney James Grady Wyly, III added to party Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wyly, James) Modified text on 9/25/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that Civil Action Nos. 18-7832 and 18-7887 are consolidated with 18-7711. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/19/2018.(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2018 re #6 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference . (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (clc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 Response to Motion, #14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Response/Memorandum in Opposition. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. ALSO, the caption on the Statement of Corporate Disclosure lists additional case numbers that are not a part of this suit. Please adjust your caption for all future pleadings.** (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Frohn, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion filed by Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. re #6 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - F)(Frohn, David) Modified event on 9/7/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Young, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request of Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. filed by Hugo Gonzalez re #2 Complaint. (Young, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference , #7 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Rec. Doc. 6). **Documents contains incorrect case numbers. The correct case number is captioned, but the caption also includes additional case numbers that should not be included on the caption. Please correct the caption for all future filings.** (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Submission of the Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference is Granted. A hearing of Plaintiffs Motion is scheduled for 9/12/2018 at 11:00 a.m. with oral argument. Memorandum in opposition shall be filed by 9/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/4/2018. (email: Raul J. Chacon, Jr., Kaylin S. Grey)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Rec. Doc. 6) by Hugo Gonzalez. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 9/4/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Hugo Gonzalez. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Notice of Submission)(Young, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **This is a duplicate filing of document 2 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Fee previously paid) filed by Hugo Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Young, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **FILED IN ERROR. SEE REC DOC 2** COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7060078) filed by Hugo Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Hugo Gonzalez(pty:pla).(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 8/15/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeremy Eades
Represented By: Alonzo T Stanga, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Courtney Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Galloway Outlaw-Knight
Represented By: Megan Cole Misko
Represented By: Joseph B Marino, III
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cortney Blair Alston
Represented By: Alonzo T Stanga, III
Represented By: John Paul Zelbst
Represented By: David Lloyd Butler
Represented By: Chandra Lorraine Holmes
Represented By: Clay Rowe Zelbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lauren M Outlaw-Knight
Represented By: Megan Cole Misko
Represented By: Joseph B Marino, III
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: David J Saltaformaggio
Represented By: James G Wyly, III
Represented By: David R Frohn
Represented By: Meghan Brianne Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Gonzalez
Represented By: Megan Cole Misko
Represented By: Joseph B Marino, III
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corp U S A
Represented By: Andrew D Weinstock
Represented By: Joseph G Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Francene Henderson
Represented By: Brett Tweedel
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Daniel Henderson
Represented By: Brett Tweedel
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?