Eades et al v. Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Plaintiff: Jeremy Eades, Courtney Alston and Cortney Blair Alston
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corp U S A
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Hugo Gonzalez, Francene Henderson and Daniel Henderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00131
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight. (This Answer to Counterclaim is filed as document #109 in lead case 2:19-cv-00130.)(crt,Crick, S).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Allen Austin Vollor for Cortney Blair Alston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 3/7/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
March 6, 2019 Filing 32 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Good Standing re #30 MOTION for Allen Austin Vollor to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Courtney Blair Alston ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3884614) . (aty,Stanga, Alonzo) Modified on 3/6/2019 to modify docket text and filer. (Crick, S).
March 1, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Deficiency to Alonzo T Stanga, III on behalf of Cortney Blair Alston regarding #30 MOTION for Allen Austin Vollor to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3884614). Reason: Needs current certificate of good standing. (crt,Crick, S)
February 27, 2019 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Cortney Blair Alston. (This Answer to Counterclaim is filed as document #105 in lead case 2:19-cv-00130.)(Attorney Alonzo T Stanga, III added to party Cortney Blair Alston(pty:cd))(crt,Crick, S)
February 25, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Allen Austin Vollor to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3884614) by Cortney Blair Alston, Courtney Alston. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alonzo T Stanga, III added to party Courtney Alston(pty:pla))(aty,Stanga, Alonzo) Modified docket text on 2/25/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified on 3/1/2019 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 3/6/2019 to remove deficient status and indicate #32 Current certificate of good standing submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).
February 21, 2019 ANSWER to 84 Second Supplemental & Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Francene Henderson, Daniel Henderson, COUNTERCLAIM against Cortney Blair Alston, Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight by Yamaha Motor Corp U S A. (This Answer, Crossclaim, Counterclaim is filed as document #102 in lead case 2:19-cv-00130.)(crt,Crick, S)
February 21, 2019 FILED IN ERROR. ANSWER to 71 Supplemental & Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson, COUNTERCLAIM against Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Cortney Blair Alston by Yamaha Motor Corp U S A. (This Answer, Crossclaim, Counterclaim is filed as document #101 in lead case 2:19-cv-00130.)(crt,Crick, S) Modified on 3/1/2019 to indicate filed in error. (Crick, S).
February 14, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cortney Blair Alston. Yamaha Motor Corp U S A served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (aty,Zelbst, John)
February 6, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Due to clerical error, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/6/2019. (crt,Whidden, C)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Case referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 2/5/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
February 4, 2019 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER referred to Judge Robert Summerhays. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 4, 2019 Filing 25 FILLED IN ERROR - PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) Modified on 2/4/2019 to flag filed in error.(Thigpen, M).
February 1, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 1, 2019 Filing 24 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-07832. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AND REASONS: Case transferred to USDC Western District of Louisiana, Lake Charles Division. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/1/19. (Case Transferred via case extraction)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that Civil Action Nos. 18-7832 and 18-7887 are consolidated with 18-7711. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/19/2018.(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Stanga, Alonzo) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #19 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. ALSO, Notice of Submission not needed for the Unopposed Motion to Consolidate. Document marked 'Filed in Error.'** (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Submission. (Zelbst, John) Modified text on 9/19/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Zelbst, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #3 Proposed Order) (sbs). Modified text on 9/19/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Lloyd Butler. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Counsel) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Clay Rowe Zelbst. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Counsel) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chandra Lorraine Holmes. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Counsel) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Paul Zelbst. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice to PHV Counsel) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Butler (Fee previously paid) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Butler, #2 Oklahoma Supreme Court Certificate, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified on 9/17/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Clay R. Zelbst (Fee previously paid) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Clay Zelbst, #2 Oklahoma Supreme Court Certificate, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/17/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chandra L. Holmes (Fee previously paid) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chandra L. Holmes, #2 Oklahoma Supreme Court Certificate, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/17/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John P. Zelbst (Fee previously paid) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John P. Zelbst, #2 Oklahoma Supreme Court Certificate, #3 Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/17/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Butler (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7113197) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of David Butler, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Appendix ECF Registration Form)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Clay Zelbst (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7113180) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Clay Zelbst, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Appendix ECF Registration Form)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chandra L. Holmes (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7113157) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Chandra L. Holmes, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Appendix ECF Registration Form)(Stanga, Alonzo) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Zelbst (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7113101) by Courtney Alston, Jeremy Eades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of John Zelbst, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stanga, Alonzo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #4 Attorney ECF Registration Form) (sbs). Modified text on 9/13/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: The captioned matter appears related to Civil Action 18-7711. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the matter be transferred to Section "I"(5) of this court, with concurrence of the Judge from the latter Section. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/28/2018.(jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Main document replaced to correct case caption. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7064678) filed by Jeremy Eades, Courtney Alston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Service to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.)Attorney Alonzo T. Stanga, III added to party Courtney Alston(pty:pla), Attorney Alonzo T. Stanga, III added to party Jeremy Eades(pty:pla).(Stanga, Alonzo) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/17/2018) (jls). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eades et al v. Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: James G Wyly, III
Represented By: David J Saltaformaggio
Represented By: David R Frohn
Represented By: Meghan Brianne Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Galloway Outlaw-Knight
Represented By: Megan Cole Misko
Represented By: Joseph B Marino, III
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hugo Gonzalez
Represented By: Megan Cole Misko
Represented By: Joseph B Marino, III
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Francene Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Daniel Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Eades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Alston
Represented By: Alonzo T Stanga, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortney Blair Alston
Represented By: Alonzo T Stanga, III
Represented By: John Paul Zelbst
Represented By: Allen Austin Vollor
Represented By: David Lloyd Butler
Represented By: Chandra Lorraine Holmes
Represented By: Clay Rowe Zelbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corp U S A
Represented By: Andrew D Weinstock
Represented By: Joseph G Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?