Outlaw Knight et al v. Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Plaintiff: Galloway Outlaw-Knight and Lauren M Outlaw-Knight
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corp U S A
3Rd Party Defendant: Jeremy Eades, Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson and Hugo Gonzalez
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Counter Defendant: Cortney Blair Alston
Case Number: 2:2019cv00132
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight. (This Answer to Counterclaim is filed as document #110 in lead case 2:19-cv-00130.)(crt,Crick, S)
February 27, 2019 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Cortney Blair Alston. (This Answer to Counterclaim is filed as document #106 in lead case 2:19-cv-00130.)(crt,Crick, S)
February 21, 2019 ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Daniel Henderson, Francene Henderson, COUNTERCLAIM against Hugo Gonzalez, Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Cortney Blair Alston by Yamaha Motor Corp U S A. (This Answer, Crossclaim, Counterclaim is filed as document #103 in lead case 2:19-cv-00130.)(crt,Crick, S)
February 6, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Due to clerical error, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/6/2019.(crt,Whidden, C)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Case Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 2/5/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 FILLED IN ERROR - PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) Modified on 2/4/2019 to flag filled in error. (Thigpen, M).
February 1, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-07887. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND REASONS: Case transferred to USDC Western District of Louisiana, Lake Charles Division. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/1/19.(Case Transferred via Case Extraction)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that Civil Action Nos. 18-7832 and 18-7887 are consolidated with 18-7711. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/19/2018.(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 9/6/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Young, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. filed by Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight re #1 Complaint. (Young, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/27/2018.(clc)(NEF: SEC. F, SEC. I, MAG 4, MAG 5) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sea Fox Boat Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7067261) filed by Galloway Outlaw-Knight, Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Galloway Outlaw-Knight(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Lauren M. Outlaw-Knight(pty:pla).(Young, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 2/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw Knight et al v. Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jeremy Eades
Represented By: Alonzo T Stanga, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Daniel Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Francene Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hugo Gonzalez
Represented By: Megan Cole Misko
Represented By: Joseph B Marino, III
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galloway Outlaw-Knight
Represented By: Megan Cole Misko
Represented By: Joseph B Marino, III
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren M Outlaw-Knight
Represented By: Megan Cole Misko
Represented By: Joseph B Marino, III
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sea Fox Boat Co Inc
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: David J Saltaformaggio
Represented By: James G Wyly, III
Represented By: David R Frohn
Represented By: Meghan Brianne Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corp U S A
Represented By: Joseph G Glass
Represented By: Andrew D Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Cortney Blair Alston
Represented By: John Paul Zelbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?