Bennett et al v. McDermott International Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kendrick Bennett, Courtlande Collins, Roger Beaumont, Jr, Larry Guillory, All Plaintiffs, Jose de Jesus Perdomo, Marcus Bennett, Brandon Broussard, Elizardo Vazquez, Miguel Aguino Toledo, Christopher Allen Perry, Peggy Bowie, Russell Reitzer, Arturo Ortiz Espinoza, Daniel Soriano, Thomas R Walker, Juana Ruiz, Danny G Allen, Patrick Culbert, Epifano Sanchez, Byron Andre Gosey, Gabino Gomez, Jr, Joseph Bonner, Christine Weaver, Oscar Veliz Alvarado, Orlando Montilla, Oscar M Veliz, Derrick Celestine, Matthew Scie, Kenneth Scott Nettles, Gay L Hughes, Georgia Anderson, Jose Gallegos, Jason Wayne Lyons, Andris Baque, David Bartlett, Cody Anderson, Jesus Deluna, Anyelis Salvado Suarez, Jose Gutierrez, Jaime Trevino, Adelita Cunningham, Thaddeus A Brent, Mayda Ariosa Martinez, Cody Breeland, Christina Lewis, Shahi Vijayan, Kenney Bell, Willie E Rice, Kamorrah Nicole Bowie, Manuel J Garcia Veytia, Kevin Stewart, Brandon Porter, Juan Acuna, Christian Garcia, Demondre Terry, Samantha Moy, Montenegro Alexis Franco, Wenefredo Andeza, Omar Aguilar Aldana, Joel Atilano, Charles Dollins, Erick Harry, Francis Mercedes, Aisha Anderson, Richard Jack, Juan Maldonado, Trillion LeDuff, Hector Canto Guerrero, Eleazar Abundis, Jonathon Beritiech, Angel Fernandez-Garcia, Terry Wayne Cochran, Erick Broussard, Haydee Clarivel Moreno Pacho, Kenny Bolton, Cristina Cordero Herrera, Justin Bibby, Shayra Arias, Lakeya Bell, Carlos A Guity, Kimberly Briscoe, Jose Victor Rodrique Ochoa, Heriberto Hernandez, Theron Freeman, Jorge A Moran Pagan, Germaine Broussard, Fredrick Barrett, Brandon Ashford, Davidson B Aldonza, Yordan Aguitera, Andrew Fowler, Kleaton Williams, German Gutierrez, Eduards Maireni Diaz Casilla, Evan James Rosteet, Ricky Taveras, Charles Johnson, Sentresha E Davis, Daylin Alfaro, Hunter Barfield, Douglas Alonso, Osmany Alvarez Olivera, Tameka Hendricks, Moises Botello, Kaitlyn Mae Boughton, Travis Birden, Wilber Pupo Hernandez, Rolando A Ramirez Ferez, Treshun Porter, Sean Noah Somersall, Michael Howard Fields, Jr, Cameron Johnson, Reynaldo Arredondo, Jr, Christian Adolfo Ruiz, Henry Llorens, Wilson Patric Bell, Winford Boudreaux, II, LaShondra James, Jose A Salinas, Martires Rodriguez Lopez and Rolando Cavazos, Jr
Defendant: Cameron LNG, LLC, Chiyoda International Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron, Co., McDermott International Inc, Cameron L N G L L C, Chicago Bridge & Iron Co and Chiyoda International Corp
Case Number: 2:2019cv00158
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Amend #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Kendrick Bennett. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Amended Class and Collective Complaint, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 4/5/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent to Opt-In by Cody Anderson, Marcus Bennett, Rolando Cavazos, Jr, Adelita Cunningham, Eduards Maireni Diaz Casilla, Angel Fernandez-Garcia, Jose Gallegos, Manuel J Garcia Veytia, Erick Harry, Tameka Hendricks, Gay L Hughes, Trillion LeDuff, Christina Lewis, Jason Wayne Lyons, Jorge A Moran Pagan, Russell Reitzer, Evan James Rosteet, Jose A Salinas, Kevin Stewart, Shahi Vijayan and Kleaton Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 4/5/2019 to edit text and filers (Putch, A).
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Opt-In by Eleazar Abundis, Omar Aguilar Aldana, Yordan Aguitera, Davidson B Aldonza, Daylin Alfaro, Douglas Alonso, Osmany Alvarez Olivera, Aisha Anderson, Georgia Anderson, Wenefredo Andeza, Miguel Aguino Toledo, Shayra Arias, Mayda Ariosa Martinez, Reynaldo Arredondo, Jr, Brandon Ashford, Joel Atilano, Andris Baque, Fredrick Barrett, David Bartlett, Roger Beaumont, Jr, Kenney Bell, Lakeya Bell, Jonathon Beritiech, Justin Bibby, Travis Birden, Kenny Bolton, Joseph Bonner, Winford Boudreaux, II, Kaitlyn Mae Boughton, Kamorrah Nicole Bowie, Peggy Bowie, Cody Breeland, Thaddeus A Brent, Kimberly Briscoe, Brandon Broussard and Matthew Scie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Consent to Opt-In (Exhibit A))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 4/4/2019 to edit filers (Putch, A).
April 1, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to All Plaintiffs regarding #9 Waiver of Service Executed. Action taken: Answer deadline removed as CB&I LLC is not a named defendant in this action. (crt,Putch, A)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kendrick Bennett. C B & I L L C waiver sent on 3/1/2019. (aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 4/3/2019 to remove answer due deadline as CB&I LLC is not a named defendant (Putch, A).
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kendrick Bennett. McDermott International Inc waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (aty,Sudduth, James)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Opt-In by Derrick Celestine, Andrew Fowler, Christian Garcia, Gabino Gomez, Jr, Byron Andre Gosey, Heriberto Hernandez, Richard Jack, Cameron Johnson, Charles Johnson, Samantha Moy, Brandon Porter, Treshun Porter, Rolando A Ramirez Ferez, Willie E Rice, Christian Adolfo Ruiz, Epifano Sanchez and Christine Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent to Opt-In (Exhibit A))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 4/1/2019 to filers (Putch, A).
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent to Opt-In by Oscar M Veliz, Oscar Veliz Alvarado, Elizardo Vazquez, Jaime Trevino, Ricky Taveras, Daniel Soriano, Sean Noah Somersall, Juana Ruiz, Jose de Jesus Perdomo, Jose Victor Rodriquez Ochoa, Kenneth Scott Nettles, Haydee Clarivel Moreno Pacho, Orlando Montilla, Montenegro Alexis Franco, LaShondra James, Cristina Cordero Herrera, German Gutierrez, Jose Gutierrez, Carlos A Guity, Larry Guillory, Theron Freeman, Arturo Ortiz Espinoza, Jesus Deluna, Sentresha E Davis, Patrick Culbert, Charles Dollins, Germaine Broussard, Moises Botello, Wilson Patric Bell, Hunter Barfield, Danny G Allen and Juan Acuna. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent to Opt-In)(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 3/26/2019 to add filers (Putch, A).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Opt-In by Erick Broussard, Terry Wayne Cochran, Michael Howard Fields, Jr, Hector Canto Guerrero, Wilber Pupo Hernandez, Henry Llorens, Juan Maldonado, Francis Mercedes, Christopher Allen Perry, Martires Rodriguez Lopez, Anyelis Salvado Suarez, Demondre Terry and Thomas R Walker. (Attachments: #1 Notices of Consent to Opt-In)(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 3/26/2019 to edit filers (Putch, A).
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kendrick Bennett. Chiyoda International Corp waiver sent on 2/11/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (aty,Sudduth, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kendrick Bennett. Cameron L N G L L C waiver sent on 2/11/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (aty,Sudduth, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cameron L N G L L C, Chicago Bridge & Iron Co, Chiyoda International Corp, McDermott International Inc (crt,Putch, A)
February 7, 2019 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Putch, A)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION AND COLLECTIVE ACTION against McDermott International Inc, Chicago Bridge & Iron Co, Chiyoda International Corp, Cameron L N G L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3871971) filed by Kendrick Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit Verification)(Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III added to party Kendrick Bennett(pty:pla))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 2/8/2019 edit text (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. McDermott International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron LNG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiyoda International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bridge & Iron, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron L N G L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bridge & Iron Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiyoda International Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Bennett
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtlande Collins
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Beaumont, Jr
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Guillory
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose de Jesus Perdomo
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Bennett
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Broussard
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizardo Vazquez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Aguino Toledo
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Perry
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Bowie
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Reitzer
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Ortiz Espinoza
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Soriano
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R Walker
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Ruiz
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny G Allen
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Culbert
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epifano Sanchez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Andre Gosey
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabino Gomez, Jr
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bonner
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Weaver
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Veliz Alvarado
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Montilla
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar M Veliz
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Celestine
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Scie
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Scott Nettles
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gay L Hughes
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Anderson
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gallegos
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wayne Lyons
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andris Baque
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bartlett
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Anderson
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Deluna
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anyelis Salvado Suarez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gutierrez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Trevino
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelita Cunningham
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus A Brent
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayda Ariosa Martinez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Breeland
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Lewis
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahi Vijayan
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenney Bell
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie E Rice
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamorrah Nicole Bowie
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel J Garcia Veytia
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Stewart
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Porter
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Acuna
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Garcia
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demondre Terry
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Moy
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montenegro Alexis Franco
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenefredo Andeza
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Aguilar Aldana
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Atilano
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dollins
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Harry
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Mercedes
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aisha Anderson
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jack
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Maldonado
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trillion LeDuff
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Canto Guerrero
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleazar Abundis
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Beritiech
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Fernandez-Garcia
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Wayne Cochran
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Broussard
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haydee Clarivel Moreno Pacho
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Bolton
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Cordero Herrera
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bibby
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayra Arias
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeya Bell
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A Guity
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Briscoe
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Victor Rodrique Ochoa
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Hernandez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theron Freeman
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A Moran Pagan
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine Broussard
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Barrett
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ashford
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davidson B Aldonza
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yordan Aguitera
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Fowler
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kleaton Williams
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Gutierrez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduards Maireni Diaz Casilla
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan James Rosteet
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Taveras
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Johnson
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentresha E Davis
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daylin Alfaro
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Barfield
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Alonso
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osmany Alvarez Olivera
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka Hendricks
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Botello
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Mae Boughton
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Birden
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilber Pupo Hernandez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando A Ramirez Ferez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treshun Porter
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Noah Somersall
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Howard Fields, Jr
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Johnson
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Arredondo, Jr
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Adolfo Ruiz
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Llorens
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Patric Bell
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winford Boudreaux, II
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShondra James
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Salinas
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martires Rodriguez Lopez
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Cavazos, Jr
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?