Holleman et al v. Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Plaintiff: Mike Holleman and Martha Holleman
Defendant: Bergman, Walls & Associates, Ltd. - Architects, Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C, Bergman Walls & Associates Ltd and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv00477
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Martha Holleman. (aty,Camel, Kevin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Bergman Walls & Associates Ltd. (aty,Carroll, Taylor)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency to Taylor Stephen Carroll on behalf of Bergman Walls & Associates Ltd regarding #9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8 for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENT MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Bergman Walls & Associates Ltd. (aty,Carroll, Taylor) Modified to indicate deficient status on 6/3/2019 (ThomasSld, T). Modified to indicate document corrected and resubmitted in its entirety as document #11 on 6/3/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Martha Holleman. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Camel, Kevin)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Attached Document Exhibit C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/2/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/23/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bergman, Walls & Associates, Ltd. - Architects. (aty,Carroll, Taylor)
April 15, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bergman Walls & Associates Ltd, Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co filed by Martha Holleman, Mike Holleman. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, Amended Complaint, by Bergman Walls & Associates Ltd. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Attached Document Exhibit C by Bergman, Walls & Associates, Ltd. - Architects. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C (to be sealed))(aty,Carroll, Taylor)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2016-2171 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3925071) filed by Bergman, Walls & Associates, Ltd. - Architects. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Attorney Taylor Stephen Carroll added to party Bergman, Walls & Associates, Ltd. - Architects(pty:dft))(aty,Carroll, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holleman et al v. Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Holleman
Represented By: Kevin L Camel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Holleman
Represented By: Kevin L Camel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergman, Walls & Associates, Ltd. - Architects
Represented By: Taylor Stephen Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Nugget Lake Charles L L C
Represented By: Michael J Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergman Walls & Associates Ltd
Represented By: Taylor Stephen Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?