Matte v. Henderson Implement & Marine L L C
Plaintiff: Danica Matte
Defendant: Henderson Implement and Marine, LLC and Henderson Implement & Marine L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv00541
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
2 Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Henderson Implement & Marine L L C. (aty,David, Robert) Modified on 7/3/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Answer to Complaint sent to Robert J David, Jr on behalf of Henderson Implement & Marine L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/16/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 7/2/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Henderson Implement & Marine L L C.(Attorney Robert J David, Jr added to party Henderson Implement & Marine L L C(pty:dft))(aty,David, Robert)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to James Edward Sudduth, III on behalf of Danica Matte regarding #3 Waiver of Service Executed. Action taken: Docket text modified to reflect correct mailing date as 05/02/2019 and answer due date as 07/01/2019 as an incorrect service date was entered at the time of e-filing. (crt,Crick, S)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danica Matte. Henderson Implement & Marine L L C waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 5/20/2019 to modify mailing date and answer deadlines as an erroneous service date was entered at the time of e-filing. (Crick, S).
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Henderson Implement & Marine L L C (crt,Crick, S)
April 29, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henderson Implement & Marine L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3935177) filed by Danica Matte. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III added to party Danica Matte(pty:pla))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 4/29/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matte v. Henderson Implement & Marine L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danica Matte
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Implement and Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Implement & Marine L L C
Represented By: Robert J David, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?