Wallace v. Performance Contractors Inc

Plaintiff: Magan Wallace
Defendant: Performance Contractors, Inc. and Performance Contractors Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00649
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Performance Contractors Inc. (aty,Stovall, Jerry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Performance Contractors Inc.(Attorney Jerry L Stovall, Jr added to party Performance Contractors Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Stovall, Jerry)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Judge Foote no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Judge Foote are hereby reset before Judge Cain. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E. Foote.(crt,Benoit, T)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Magan Wallace. Performance Contractors Inc waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (aty,Sudduth, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Performance Contractors Inc (crt,Putch, A)
May 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Putch, A)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Performance Contractors Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3953315) filed by Magan Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III added to party Magan Wallace)(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Performance Contractors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Contractors Inc
Represented By: Murphy J Foster, III
Represented By: Jerry L Stovall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magan Wallace
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?