Dollins v. United Rentals North America Inc
Plaintiff: Christopher Dollins
Defendant: United Rentals North America Inc and United Rentals Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00666
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
2 Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Due to reassignment of this case, the Pre-Trial Conference currently set for 4/22/2020 will be held in Lake Charles, Louisiana in chambers before the undersigned.. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/17/2019. (crt,Petrofes, T)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/5/2019 at 3:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Counsel for plaintiff should initiate the phone conference to include all counsel of record and chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/11/2019. (crt,Solari, E)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Judge Juneau are hereby reset before Judge Cain. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 7/3/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY: Due to a scheduling conflict on the Courts calendar, the Pretrial Conference in this matter that was set for April 22, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby RESET for April 22, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. (Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2020 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau.)(crt,Guidry, C)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 09:30 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2020 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 7/16/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/22/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 8/13/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 10/25/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 9/25/2019. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/25/2019. Discovery deadline 11/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/24/2019. Daubert Motions due by 12/24/2019. Motions in Limine due by 3/23/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 3/23/2020. Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2020. Bench Books due by 4/8/2020. Trial Depositions due by 4/8/2020. Real Time glossary due by 4/15/2020. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 4/15/2020. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 6/25/19. (crt,Guidry, C)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES for proceedings held with Courtroom Deputy: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/25/2019. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 09:30 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2020 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Guidry, C)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: At the request of counsel for the plaintiff, the telephone status conference with the Courtroom Deputy originally scheduled for 6/20/19 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby reset for Tuesday, June 25, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019 09:30 AM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy) (crt,Guidry, C)
June 14, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #8 MOTION to Continue Telephone Scheduling Conference with consent. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Telephone Scheduling Conference with consent by Christopher Dollins. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Bice, Jere)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY:At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on June 20, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. Trial counsel must participate in this conference. A paralegal or secretary may not be substituted. If, for good cause, this is not possible, you must file a Motion and Order to Continue prior to the above date. (Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 10:00 AM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.)(crt,Guidry, C)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Rentals North America Inc naming United Rentals Inc as corporate parent. (aty,Benjamin, Jack) Modified on 5/30/2019 to add corporate parent (JonesSld, P).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/28/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by United Rentals North America Inc.(Attorney Jack C Benjamin, Jr added to party United Rentals Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Benjamin, Jack) Modified on 5/28/2019 to edit filer (JonesSld, P).
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jack C Benjamin, Jr, Guy D Perrier on behalf of United Rentals North America Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Rentals North America Inc filed by Christopher Dollins. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #9 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC - Calcasieu, Case Number 2019-0945 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3957024) filed by United Rentals North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 List of Parties, #11 List of Pleadings)(Attorney Jack C Benjamin, Jr added to party United Rentals North America Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Benjamin, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dollins v. United Rentals North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals North America Inc
Represented By: Jack C Benjamin, Jr
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals Inc
Represented By: Jack C Benjamin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dollins
Represented By: Jere Jay Bice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?