Rolfe v. Ace American Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Donald E Rolfe
Defendant: C R S T Lincoln Sales Inc, Ace American Insurance Co and Justin Bachman
Intervenor Plaintiff: American Zurich Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv00720
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #21 Intervenor Complaint by Ace American Insurance Co, Justin Bachman, C R S T Lincoln Sales Inc.(aty,Remondet, Michael) Modified on 7/31/2019 to modify docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by American Zurich Insurance Co.(crt,Crick, S)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #19 Intervenor Complaint, #21 Intervenor Complaint. Action taken: Modified docket text to indicate #19 Intervenor Complaint filed in error. Correct #21 Intervenor Complaint submitted. (crt,Crick, S)
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 FILED IN ERROR. INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by American Zurich Insurance Co.(crt,Crick, S) Modified on 7/31/2019 to indicate filed in error. See #21 Intervenor Complaint. (Crick, S).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion to Intervene by American Zurich Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/29/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED PROPOSED COMPLAINT in Intervention re 15 Order and #11 Motion to Intervene filed by American Zurich Insurance Co.(aty,Simmons, Jennifer) Modified on 7/25/2019 to modify docket text and create docket (Crick, S).
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Damages served on C R S T Lincoln Sales Inc on 05/17/2019 filed by Donald E Rolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(aty,Webre, Scott) Modified on 7/23/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER. On or before 7/26/2019, mover is to amend its #11 MOTION to Intervene or the proposed complaint itself to set forth the citizenship of the proposed intervenor and to brief the court on whether this intervention would be considered permissive or mandatory and the extent to which this proposed intervention does or does not destroy diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/14/2019. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint of Intervention by Ace American Insurance Co, Justin Bachman, C R S T Lincoln Sales Inc.(aty,Remondet, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Unassigned District Judge are hereby reset before Judge Cain. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr.(crt,Whidden, C)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Zurich Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, Steadfast Insurance Co, Zurich American Insurance Co, Zurich Holding Co of America Inc, Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. (aty,Simmons, Jennifer) Modified on 7/3/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene with consent by American Zurich Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Simmons, Jennifer) Modified on 7/3/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). Modified on 7/31/2019 to indicate #17 Amended Proposed pleading submitted. (Crick, S).
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency to Jennifer L Simmons on behalf of American Zurich Insurance Co regarding #8 MOTION to Intervene with consent . Reason: The document is not on letter-size paper as required by LR10.1. Please re-submit this document in proper form.. (crt,Crick, S)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENT. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Zurich Insurance Co. (aty,Simmons, Jennifer) Modified on 7/3/2019 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 7/3/2019 to indicate #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement resubmitted in its entirety. (Crick, S).
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENT. MOTION to Intervene with consent by American Zurich Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Simmons, Jennifer) Modified on 7/3/2019 on to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 7/3/2019 to indicate #11 Motion to Intervene resubmitted in its entirety. (Crick, S).
July 3, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Jennifer L Simmons on behalf of American Zurich Insurance Co regarding #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 MOTION to Intervene with consent . Action taken: #8 Motion to Intervene, #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement terminated. #11 Motion to Intervene, #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement resubmitted in their entirety. (crt,Crick, S)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Response to Removal Order, Intervenor Complaint sent to Jennifer L Simmons on behalf of American Zurich Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/3/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Ace American Insurance Co, Justin Bachman, C R S T Lincoln Sales Inc . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Certified State Court Record)(aty,Remondet, Michael)
June 19, 2019 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed on 06/12/2019 in 14th Judicial District Court, Case No 2019-1906, Calcasieu Parish, Louisiana, by American Zurich Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The pdf of this document can be located at Attachment 2 to #6 Response to Removal Order.(Attorney Jennifer L Simmons added to party American Zurich Insurance Co(pty:intvp))(crt,Crick, S)
June 19, 2019 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint by Donald E Rolfe filed on 6/18/2019 in 14th Judicial District Court, Calcasieu Parish, Louisiana in Case No 2019-1906 by Donald E Rolfe. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. PDF of document can be located at Attachment 2 to #6 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace American Insurance Co, Justin Bachman, C R S T Lincoln Sales Inc.(Attorney Michael J Remondet, Jr added to party Justin Bachman(pty:dft))(aty,Remondet, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Admiralty Holdings Inc for CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc.. (aty,Remondet, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Ltd for Ace American Insurance Company. (aty,Remondet, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2019-1906 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3966822) filed by CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed order, #4 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Attorney Michael J Remondet, Jr added to party Ace American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Remondet, Jr added to party CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Remondet, Michael)
June 7, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed by the Louisiana Long Arm Statute. C R S T Lincoln Sales Inc answer due 6/11/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 TO DOCUMENT #1 , NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Mitchell, P)
June 7, 2019 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolfe v. Ace American Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R S T Lincoln Sales Inc
Represented By: Michael J Remondet, Jr
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael J Remondet, Jr
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Bachman
Represented By: Michael J Remondet, Jr
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Rolfe
Represented By: Chad Michael Ikerd
Represented By: Scott David Webre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: American Zurich Insurance Co
Represented By: Olivia Yen Truong
Represented By: Jamie Ann Futral
Represented By: Jennifer L Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?