Four Winds Tribe Louisiana Cherokee v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Plaintiff: Four Winds Tribe Louisiana Cherokee
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Morris & Dickson Co L L C, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mallinckrodt P L C, Allergan Finance L L C, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Allergan P L C, Purdue Pharma Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma L P, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis L L C, Noramco Inc, SPECGX LLC, Cardinal Health Inc, Mallinckrodt L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd and S P E C G X L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv00760
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Northern District of Ohio on 7/18/2019, assigned case number 1:19-op-45625. (crt,Whidden, C)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 101, directing transfer to Northern District of Ohio, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL # 2804. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-101) in MDL No.2804, IN RE: National Prescription Opiate Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Unassigned District Judge are hereby reset before Judge Cain. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr.(crt,Whidden, C)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Four Winds Tribe Louisiana Cherokee. (aty,Adams, Glenn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance L L C, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Morris & Dickson Co L L C, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, S P E C G X L L C, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (crt,Crick, S)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Ralph R Alexis, III on behalf of Four Winds Tribe Louisiana Cherokee. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/1/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
June 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance L L C, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallincdrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Morris & Dickson Co L L C, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, S P E C G X L L C, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3973779) filed by Four Winds Tribe Louisiana Cherokee. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Civil cover sheet Attachment - Counsel for Plaintiff, #3 Civil cover sheet Attachment - List of Defendants)(Attorney Ralph R Alexis, III added to party Four Winds Tribe Louisiana Cherokee(pty:pla))(aty,Alexis, Ralph) Modified on 6/17/2019 (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Four Winds Tribe Louisiana Cherokee v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt P L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan P L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S P E C G X L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four Winds Tribe Louisiana Cherokee
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?