Collier v. Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C
Plaintiff: Edward Collier
Defendant: Bernhard MCC Mechanical, LLC and Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv00848
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C - no corporate parent. (aty,Keenan, Christine) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (Dunford, T).
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint sent to Christine Sciacchetano Keenan on behalf of Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/13/2019. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C.(Attorney Christine Sciacchetano Keenan added to party Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Keenan, Christine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Edward Collier. Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (aty,Sudduth, James)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Judge Foote no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Judge Foote are hereby reset before Judge Cain. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E. Foote.(crt,Benoit, T)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3987410) filed by Edward Collier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III added to party Edward Collier(pty:pla))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Collier
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Represented By: Pierce Alexander Rapin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Abrams
Represented By: Kourtney Lanea Kech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernhard MCC Mechanical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernhard M C C Mechanical L L C
Represented By: Christine Sciacchetano Keenan
Represented By: Stephen Henry Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?