Ross v. Social Security et al
Plaintiff: Ira Jerome Ross
Defendant: Office of Disability Adjudication & Review, U S Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00853
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT granting #6 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/7/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Ira Jerome Ross. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,HaikSld, K)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/19/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST from Ira Jerome Ross for copy of docket sheet. Clerk mailed copy of docket sheet on 7/17/2019. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/17/2019) (Haik, K).
July 1, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ira Jerome Ross. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office of Disability Adjudication & Review, U S Commissioner of Social Security, Social Security Administration with Jury Demand filed by Ira Jerome Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibit, #4 Letter, #5 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Disability Adjudication & Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Jerome Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?