Reeves v. Vannoy

Plaintiff: Mr. Jason Manuel Reeves and Jason Manuel Reeves
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 2:2019cv00925
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines: Compliance (Proposed Plan of Work) Deadline set for 10/8/2019. See document #14 (crt,Benoit, T)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER It is hereby ordered that the parties submit a proposed joint plan of work for this matter by October 8, 2019, setting forth response and reply deadlines for the petition as well as a plan and deadline for the lodging of the state court record. If the parties are unable to come to an agreement or have any other need for a status conference before that date, they are urged to contact chambers. After reviewing the proposed plan, the undersigned will enter a memorandum order addressing the deadlines and any other issues raised therein. Signed by Judge James D. Cain, Jr. on 9/10/2019. (crt,Higgins, M)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Jason Manuel Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhbit 29)(aty,Hudsmith, Rebecca) (Attachment 16 replaced on 9/10/2019) (Haik, K). (Attachment 15 replaced on 9/10/2019) (Haik, K). (Attachment 23 replaced on 9/10/2019) (Haik, K).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SEALED ORDER re #11 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/30/2019. (crt,HaikSld, K)
August 29, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #11 Ex Parte SEALED MOTION . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Ex Parte SEALED MOTION by Jason Manuel Reeves. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Hudsmith, Rebecca)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/29/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER: re #1 Application for Stay of Execution, filed by Jason Manuel Reeves; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Warrant for Execution of Person Condemned is hereby STAYED pending further proceedings. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/26/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Kevin C. Riach to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4008392) by Jason Manuel Reeves. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Hudsmith, Rebecca)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Christina McLellan on behalf of Darrel Vannoy (Attorney Karen Christina McLellan added to party Darrel Vannoy(pty:dft)) (aty,McLellan, Karen)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Rebecca L Hudsmith, David Aaron Novod and Kevin C Riach as Counsel. Furthermore, Mr. Novod and Mr. Riach are appointed with a nunc pro tunc date of November 13, 2018. Mr. Riach is permitted to appear and participate as co-counsel as a visiting attorney pursuant and in compliance with Local Rule 83.2.6. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/19/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/19/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 17, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jason Manuel Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit Warrant for Execution of Person Condemned)(aty,Hudsmith, Rebecca)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Manuel Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hudsmith, Rebecca)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Stay of Execution against Jason Manuel Reeves filed by Jason Manuel Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Civil cover sheet, #4 Exhibit Warrant for Execution)(Attorney Rebecca L Hudsmith added to party Jason Manuel Reeves(pty:pla))(aty,Hudsmith, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jason Manuel Reeves
Represented By: Rebecca L Hudsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Manuel Reeves
Represented By: David Aaron Novod
Represented By: Kevin C Riach
Represented By: Rebecca L Hudsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Represented By: Karen Christina McLellan
Represented By: Jeffrey M Landry
Represented By: John F Derosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?