Dan Bunkering (America) Inc v. Candy Apple et al
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. and Dan Bunkering (America) Inc
Defendant: Epic Companies L L C, CANDY APPLE, Candy Cap L P, Epic Applied Technologies L L C, M/V Candy Apple and Candy Apple L L C
Case Number: 2:2019cv00943
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #20 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 10/30/2019 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 13, 2019 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Epic Companies L L C filed by Epic Companies L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture the appropriate filing event. See pdf document filed as #21 Notice (Other). (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Epic Companies L L C of Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Attorney R Scott Jenkins added to party Epic Companies L L C(pty:dft)) (aty,Jenkins, R)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Candy Apple L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1)(aty,Hayes, Kristen) Modified on 9/16/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Candy Apple L L C. (aty,Hayes, Kristen)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #17 Statement of Interest sent to Kristen Lewis Hayes on behalf of Candy Apple L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/9/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF INTEREST by Kristen Lewis Hayes on behalf of Candy Apple L L C (Attorney Kristen Lewis Hayes added to party Candy Apple, LLC(pty:ip)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification)(aty,Hayes, Kristen) Modified on 8/26/2019 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 U S MARSHAL RECEIPT AND RETURN for Release of Seizure served on Steve Marcrum, VP Candy Apple on 8/8/2019 via email. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc of Filing Proof of Substitute Security, in rem (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Callihan, Lawton)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 USM Return Executed re: Change of Custodian. Served on Gulf Intercoastal Waterway on 8/2/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appoint Custodian Aaron Hawkins and Harold McMillan appointed. ORDERED that Global Maritime Security shall surrender the possession of the Candy Apple to the substitute custodian. ORDERED that all United States Marshal's costs be paid prior to release of said vessel, and it is further ORDERED that the substitute custodian must receipt for the Vessel and the United States Marshal must attest to the date and time of release on a certified copy thereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/2/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 SEIZURE WARRANT Returned Executed. Served on CANDY APPLE - Offshore Support Vessel on 8/1/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 1, 2019 Corrective entry: Motions Transferred regarding #11 Second MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian as Captain of the Vessel. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Reeves, T)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian as Captain of the Vessel by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Callihan, Lawton) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (Reeves, T). Modified on 8/2/2019 (Reeves, T).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appoint Custodian, Global Maritime Security appointed. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/26/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Permit Cargo and Repair Operations and Movement of Vessel. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/26/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT for Arrest in Rem issued (crt,Benoit, T)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/26/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Candy Apple, Candy Cap L P, Epic Applied Technologies L L C and Epic Companies L L C. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Affidavit)(aty,Callihan, Lawton)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Warrant for Arrest filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc regarding #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem . (aty,Callihan, Lawton) Modified on 7/25/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
July 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Permit Cargo and Repair Operations and Movement of Vessel by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Callihan, Lawton)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Callihan, Lawton) Modified on 7/25/2019 to indicate Proposed Warrant filed as document #4 (Dauterive, C).
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Candy Apple, Candy Cap L P, Epic Applied Technologies L L C and Epic Companies L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4004499) filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Callihan, Lawton) Modified on 7/25/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc v. Candy Apple et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Companies L L C
Represented By: Grady S Hurley
Represented By: R Scott Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANDY APPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Cap L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Applied Technologies L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Candy Apple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Apple L L C
Represented By: Kristen Lewis Hayes
Represented By: Edward H Arnold, III
Represented By: Christopher M Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc
Represented By: Matthew C Guy
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?