Duhon v. Hyundai Motor America
Plaintiff: Lydia Duhon
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00945
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Hyundai Motor America . (Attachments: #1 State court petition State Court Record)(aty,Maxwell, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Hyundai Motor America . (aty,Maxwell, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hyundai Motor America.(aty,Maxwell, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/24/2019. (crt,LaCombe, L)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hyundai Motor America. (aty,Maxwell, Robert)
July 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu parish, Case Number 2019-2820 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4004585) filed by Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Damages)(Attorney Robert William Maxwell added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(aty,Maxwell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duhon v. Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Duhon
Represented By: Douglas Cooper Fournet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Robert William Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?