Vaughn v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sandra Denise Vaughn
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01037
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of David F Chermol for Sandra Denise Vaughn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/19/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4026998) by Sandra Denise Vaughn. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Bordelon, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/13/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Bunting, M)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/12/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandra Denise Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Bordelon, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Sandra Denise Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons OGC, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAO)(Attorney Robert L Bordelon, Jr added to party Sandra Denise Vaughn(pty:pla))(aty,Bordelon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Denise Vaughn
Represented By: Robert L Bordelon, Jr
Represented By: David F Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?