Anderson v. M G M Resorts International, et al
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Anderson
Defendant: M G M Resorts International and X Y Z Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv01161
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL granting #5 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, with plaintiff to bear all applicable costs of court. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 9/24/2019. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Voluntary MOTION to Dismiss by Debra Ann Anderson. (aty,Carter, Wilford) Modified on 9/19/2019 to more accurately describe document. (Crick, S).
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to M G M Resorts International (crt,Crick, S)
September 5, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Debra Ann Anderson. (crt,Crick, S)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR. CIVIL COVER SHEET by Debra Ann Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(aty,Carter, Wilford) Modified on 9/6/2019 to indicate #3 Civil Cover Sheet refiled in its entirety. (Crick, S).
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Debra Ann Anderson (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4041365) filed by Debra Ann Anderson.(Attorney Wilford D Carter added to party Debra Ann Anderson(pty:pla))(aty,Carter, Wilford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. M G M Resorts International, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Anderson
Represented By: Wilford D Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M G M Resorts International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?