Bering Sea Environmental, LLC v. Peterson et al
Plaintiff: Bering Sea Environmental L L C
Defendant: Matthew Derek Peterson, Warren Perkins, Christopher J Tumey, Slick Industrial Resources L L C, Scott Menard and Lance Chapman
Case Number: 2:2019cv01167
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 96 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:18-cv-00558. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
September 5, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Louisiana. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying as moot #36 Motion to Change Venue; granting #79 Motion to Change Venue; granting #82 Motion to Change Venue; granting #83 Motion Change Venue; granting #84 Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot #16 Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot #20 Motion to Change Venue. This matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/15/2019. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying #33 Motion to Dismiss; denying #34 Motion to Dismiss; denying #37 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #78 Motion for Choice of Law, denying without prejudice #80 Motion for Choice of Law; denying without prejudice #81 Motion for Choice of Law; denying without prejudice #85 Motion for Choice of Law; denying as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/15/2019. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Christopher J. Tumey. (Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 MOTION Regarding Choice of Law filed by Christopher J. Tumey. (Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 MOTION Regarding Choice of Law filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 89 REDACTION to #87 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 88 REDACTION to #86 Sealed Response to Motion, by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 87 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #84 Amended MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404, #83 MOTION re #79 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 Re-Urged Motion to Transfer Venue, #82 Amended MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404, #79 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Vanderwoude, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #6 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 86 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION Regarding Choice of Law re #78 MOTION Regarding Choice of Law , #80 MOTION to Determine Choice of Law , #85 MOTION to Determine Choice of Law , #78 MOTION Regarding Choice of Law filed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Vanderwoude, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #5 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Determine Choice of Law by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 84 Amended MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION re #79 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 Re-Urged Motion to Transfer Venue by Matthew Derek Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 82 Amended MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Christopher J. Tumey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION Regarding Choice of Law re #78 MOTION Regarding Choice of Law by Matthew Derek Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Determine Choice of Law by Christopher J. Tumey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION Regarding Choice of Law by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE by Matthew Derek Peterson re #57 Order (Henry, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard of Compliance Regarding Privilege Log (Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Christopher J. Tumey regarding Privilege Log (Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC re #57 Order Notice of Service of Privilege Log (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard of Service of Additional Disclosures Required by Paragraph 3 of the Discovery Order (Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard of Service of Supplemental Disclosures (Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE by Matthew Derek Peterson re #57 Order Notice of Service of Defendant Matthew Derek Peterson's Disclosures Required by Paragraph 3 of the Discovery Order (Henry, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Christopher J. Tumey Additional Disclosures (Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC of service of additional disclosures (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ABATING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Having considered the request, the Court finds that the motion should be GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the proceedings as to the previously filed motions to dismiss or transfer (Docket Nos. #16 , #17 , #18 , #20 , #33 , #34 , #36 , #37 ) are ABATED pending the Courts resolution of the choice of law issue. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/22/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC of Attorney Conference and Agreed To Briefing Schedule (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Matthew Derek Peterson Required by the Discovery Order (Henry, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC of Service of Supplemental Disclosures (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2019 re #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC, #36 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Matthew Derek Petersons Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 1404 filed by Matthew Derek Peterson, #20 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Christopher J. Tumey, #19 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Scott Menard, Lance Chapman, #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC, #37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Matthew Derek Petersons Motion For Partial Dismissal Of Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) And/Or For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) filed by Matthew Derek Peterson, #34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Scott Menard, Lance Chapman, #18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Scott Menard, Lance Chapman, #33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer.) (SMC) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T Milam on behalf of Christopher J. Tumey (Milam, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Christopher J. Tumey First Supplement to Initial Disclosures (Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions as follows: #37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Matthew Derek Petersons Motion For Partial Dismissal Of Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) And/Or For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e), #36 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Matthew Derek Petersons Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 1404, #34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement , #20 MOTION to Change Venue, #33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #18 MOTION to Change Venue , #16 MOTION to Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/2/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/29/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/29/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET APRIL 17, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. The scheduling conference is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/29/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, granting #52 Joint MOTION to Enter Agreed Docket Control Order, Agreed Discovery Order, and Agreed Protective Order. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 1/21/2020 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.>br> Jury Trial set for 1/27/2020 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/29/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in support of its #16 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/29/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Warren C. Perkins are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/29/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Enter Agreed Docket Control Order, Agreed Discovery Order, and Agreed Protective Order by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Support re #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (DeVilbiss, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVilbiss, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC of Dismissal of Claims against Warren C. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 4/17/2019 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Parties shall prepare and submit a joint motion attaching a joint proposed docket control order and a joint proposed discovery order seven days before the conference. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/15/2019. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by Matthew Derek Peterson of Service of Initial Disclosures (Henry, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard of Service of Initial Disclosures (Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by Christopher J. Tumey of Defendant Christopher J. Tumey's Service of Initial Disclosures (Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 42 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/26/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Matthew Derek Petersons Motion For Partial Dismissal Of Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(6) And/Or For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) by Matthew Derek Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Matthew Derek Petersons Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 1404 by Matthew Derek Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement , #33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vanderwoude, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2019: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (rlf, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Jamie) Modified on 8/16/2019 (mll, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Matthew Derek Peterson to 2/19/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lance Chapman to 2/1/2019. Seven Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Scott Menard to 2/1/2019. Seven Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is thereforeORDERED that leave is granted to Slick Industrial Resources, LLC to file a Reply in support of its Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 which does not exceed ten (10) pages. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/31/2019. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Matthew Derek Peterson.( Henry, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lance Chapman.( Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Scott Menard.( Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Slick Industrial Resources, LLC to 2/1/2019. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Slick Industrial Resources, LLC.( Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 27 DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER J. TUMEY'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Christopher J. Tumey.(Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement , #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lance Chapman, Scott Menard, Warren Perkins, Matthew Derek Peterson, Slick Industrial Resources, LLC, Christopher J. Tumey, filed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC.(Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Change Venue , #20 MOTION to Change Venue , #18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Change Venue by Christopher J. Tumey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue by Lance Chapman, Scott Menard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Jamie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue by Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of C. Tumey, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER J. TUMEY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by Christopher J. Tumey.(Porter, Leigh) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Advised this date that Peter Pohorelsky filed #14 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time as a courtesy for Christopher Tumey, but he does not represent Mr. Tumey, so termed him as counsel. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Christopher J. Tumey to 12/28/2018. 22 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Christopher J. Tumey.( Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. Matthew Derek Peterson waiver sent on 12/5/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Warren Perkins by Warren Perkins. (Wallace, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P Wallace on behalf of Warren Perkins (Wallace, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. Scott Menard waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. Warren Perkins served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. Christopher J. Tumey served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
November 28, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #7 rReturn of Service submitted by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. Docket text indicates incorrect date of service. Correction should be made by within one business day. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. Christopher J. Tumey served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Vanderwoude, Brian) Modified on 11/28/2018 (rlf). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. Slick Industrial Resources, LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Phillip W. DeVilbiss on behalf of Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7024293. (DeVilbiss, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Peter J. Pohorelsky on behalf of Slick Industrial Resources, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7024265. (Pohorelsky, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Lance Chapman, Scott Menard, Warren Perkins, Matthew Derek Peterson, Christopher J. Tumey. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS - Chapman, #2 SUMMONS - Menard, #3 SUMMONS - Perkins, #4 SUMMONS - Tumey)(rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
October 29, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III added. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC Plaintiff's (Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6999868.), filed by Bering Sea Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vanderwoude, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bering Sea Environmental, LLC v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Derek Peterson
Represented By: James Naughton Henry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Perkins
Represented By: Michael P Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J Tumey
Represented By: Peter Jan Pohorelsky
Represented By: Leigh Campbell Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slick Industrial Resources L L C
Represented By: Peter Jan Pohorelsky
Represented By: Phillip W DeVilbiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Menard
Represented By: Jamie Christopher Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Chapman
Represented By: Jamie Christopher Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bering Sea Environmental L L C
Represented By: Brian Vanderwoude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?