Jackson v. Allemand
Plaintiff: Jevorrie Jackson
Defendant: Colonel Allemand
Case Number: 2:2019cv01192
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11707. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint filed by the plaintiff, Jevorrie Jackson, is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/11/2019.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that the #1 Complaint filed by Jevorrie Jackson be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on August 28, 2019.(mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/7/2019. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 *DEFICIENT* COMPLAINT against Colonel Allemand filed by Jevorrie Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Allemand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Allemand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jevorrie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?